Williams v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Plaintiff: Naomi Williams
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv09222
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: J Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. GRANTED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (bh)
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (dnh)
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to National Railroad Passenger Corporation, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Naomi Williams. (Bordes, Kenneth)
October 21, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #3 MOTION for C. Perrin Rome, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17799154. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for C. Perrin Rome, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17799154. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Naomi Williams. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 LA COGS, #4 PA COGS, #5 DC COGS)(Bordes, Kenneth)
October 7, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Kenneth Bordes. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Naomi Williams, National Railroad Passenger Corporation. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; alias party name was omitted. (pne)
October 7, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
October 7, 2019 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
October 7, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Bordes, Kenneth)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17721131)Document filed by Naomi Williams.(Bordes, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naomi Williams
Represented By: Kenneth Bordes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?