Leibowitz et al v. iFinex Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Benjamin Leibowitz, Pinchas Goldshtein, Jason Leibowitz, David Leibowitz and Aaron Leibowitz
Defendant: BFXNA Inc., Tether International Limited, Ludovicus Jan van der Velde, Tether Holdings Limited, iFinex Inc., Philip G. Potter, Tether Limited, Crypto Capital Corp., Reginald Fowler, Tether Operations Limited, Giancarlo Devasini, DigFinex Inc., Global Trade Solutions AG and BFXWW Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv09236
Filed: October 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 Filing 60 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Constantine Philip Economides on behalf of Pinchas Goldshtein, Aaron Leibowitz, Benjamin Leibowitz, David Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz. (Economides, Constantine)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER: The Court recently received Young v. iFinex, Inc., No. 20 Civ. 169, as a case related to a previously assigned case, Leibowitz v. iFinex, Inc., No. 19 Civ. 9236. The parties in both cases are hereby ORDERED to provide the Court with a letter brief, not to exceed five pages in length, stating their positions regarding whether the two cases should be consolidated. These letter briefs shall be filed on or before January 24, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 1/13/2020) (rro)
January 3, 2020 Filing 58 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion to Appoint Roche Freedman LLP and Schneider Wallace Cottrell Konecky LLP as Interim Class Counsel. Document filed by Pinchas Goldshtein, Aaron Leibowitz, Benjamin Leibowitz, David Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kyle W. Roche, #2 Exhibit 1 to Roche Declaration, #3 Declaration of Jason H Kim, #4 Exhibit 1 to Kim Declaration)(Roche, Kyle)
December 20, 2019 Filing 57 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #56 Letter re: intent to file a motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Reginald Fowler. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/20/2019) (rj)
December 20, 2019 Filing 56 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Michael C. Hefter dated December 20, 2019 re: intent to file a motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint. Document filed by Reginald Fowler.(Hefter, Michael)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #54 Letter filed by Tether Limited, Giancarlo Devasini, Ludovicus Jan van der Velde. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. Defendants Ludovicus Jan van der Velde, Giancarlo Devasini, and Tether Limited shall file their motions to dismiss pursuant to the same schedule established in the Court's Order of December 3, 2019. (Dkt. #43). (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/17/2019) (cf)
December 17, 2019 Filing 54 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Jim Walden dated 12/17/2019 re: Pre-Motion Letter for Permission to File Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Giancarlo Devasini, Tether Limited, Ludovicus Jan van der Velde.(Walden, James)
December 13, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Beal on behalf of Giancarlo Devasini, Tether Limited, Ludovicus Jan van der Velde. (Beal, Christopher)
December 13, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sunjina Kaur Ahuja on behalf of Giancarlo Devasini, Tether Limited, Ludovicus Jan van der Velde. (Ahuja, Sunjina)
December 13, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Jason Lee on behalf of Giancarlo Devasini, Tether Limited, Ludovicus Jan van der Velde. (Lee, Michael)
December 12, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephanie Tsay Levick on behalf of Giancarlo Devasini, Tether Limited, Ludovicus Jan van der Velde. (Levick, Stephanie)
December 12, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Arthur Cohen on behalf of Giancarlo Devasini, Tether Limited, Ludovicus Jan van der Velde. (Cohen, Daniel)
December 12, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Walden on behalf of Giancarlo Devasini, Tether Limited, Ludovicus Jan van der Velde. (Walden, James)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #46 Letter filed by Reginald Fowler. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. In light of Plaintiffs' and Defendant Fowler's agreement, the certificate of default entered against Defendant Fowler is hereby VACATED. (Dkt. # 44). Defendant Fowler is ORDERED to instruct the Court on or before December 20, 2019, whether he intends to file a motion to dismiss or answer Plaintiffs' complaint. If Defendant Fowler intends to move to dismiss the complaint, the Court will permit Defendant Fowler to proceed under the same briefing schedule already set for certain other defendants. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/06/2019) (ama)
December 6, 2019 Filing 46 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Michael C. Hefter dated December 6, 2019 re: the Certificate of Default and placing Defendant Reginald Fowler on the same briefing schedule as the Corporate Defendants set forth in the Courts Scheduling Order #43 . Document filed by Reginald Fowler.(Hefter, Michael)
December 5, 2019 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING RECEIVED for one copy of the Summons(ECF No. 7) and Complaint (ECF No. 1) with Exhibits 1-51 (ECf Nos. 1-1 through 1-51) mailed to Ludovicus Jan van der Velde at 27 Lo Wai Tsuen Pui O Lantau, Island, Hong Kong on 11/26/2019 by UPS tracking # 1Z 6Y2 F45 DG 9634 4523, as per #38 Clerk Certificate of Mailing, RECEIVED ON: 12/3/2019. (smc)
December 5, 2019 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING RECEIVED for one copy of the Summons(ECF No. 7) and Complaint (ECF No. 1) with Exhibits 1-51 (ECf Nos. 1-1 through 1-51) mailed to Tether Limited c/o Proxy Secretarial Services Limited, ROOM 803 K. Wah Centre 191 Java Road, North Point, Hong Kong on 11/26/2019 by UPS tracking # 1Z 6Y2 F45 67 6301 2293, as per #39 Clerk Certificate of Mailing, RECEIVED ON: 12/2/2019. (smc)
December 5, 2019 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING RECEIVED for one copy of the Summons(ECF No. 7) and Complaint (ECF No. 1) with Exhibits 1-51 ECf Nos. 1-1 through 1-51 mailed to Giancarlo Devasini at 87 Avenue Winston Churchill 06190 Roquebrune-Cap-Martin, France on 11/26/2019 by UPS tracking # 1Z 6Y2 F45 DG 9634 3426, as per #37 Clerk Certificate of Mailing, RECEIVED ON: 11/29/2019. (smc)
December 4, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael C. Hefter on behalf of Reginald Fowler. (Hefter, Michael)
December 4, 2019 Filing 44 Vacated as per Judge's Order dated 12/06/2019, Doc. # 47 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to Reginald Fowler. (km) Modified on 12/6/2019 (ama).
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 SCHEDULING ORDER: On November 15, Defendants Tether Holdings Limited, Tether Operations Limited, Tether International Limited, iFinex Inc., BFXNA Inc., BFXWW Inc., and DigFinex Inc. (together, "Corporate Defendants") filed a letter requesting leave to file a motion to dismiss. (Dkt. #28). Plaintiffs replied to that letter indicating that they do not oppose the filing of a motion to dismiss. (Dkt. #35). The Court ordered Plaintiffs to advise the Court as to whether they would like to amend their complaint, and what steps they contemplated taking regarding defendants that have not yet appeared in this action. (Dkt. #36). On December 2, 2019, Plaintiffs advised the Court that they did not wish to amend their complaint, and that several defendants had just been, or would soon be, served. (Dkt. #40). In an effort to balance the interest of the Defendants that have appeared in progressing the case and filing a motion to dismiss, as well as the potential interest of the Defendants who have yet to appear in joining such a motion to dismiss, the Court will set the following briefing schedule: Defendants shall file their motions to dismiss on or before February 3, 2020, Plaintiffs shall file their opposition papers on or before March 9, 2020, and Defendants shall file their reply papers, if any, on or before March 23, 2020. The Court will keep the initial pretrial conference, currently scheduled for 3:00 p.m. on February 7, 2020, in Courtroom 618 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York, on the calendar, in order to address any issues of service remaining at that time. (Motions due by 2/3/2020. Responses due by 3/9/2020 Replies due by 3/23/2020.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/3/2019) (rro)
December 3, 2019 Filing 42 DECLARATION of Joseph M. Delich in Support re: #41 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default,. Document filed by Pinchas Goldshtein, Aaron Leibowitz, Benjamin Leibowitz, David Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz. (Delich, Joseph)
December 3, 2019 Filing 41 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Pinchas Goldshtein, Aaron Leibowitz, Benjamin Leibowitz, David Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz. (Delich, Joseph) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).
December 2, 2019 Filing 40 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Kyle W. Roche dated December 2, 2019 re: ECF No. 36. Document filed by Pinchas Goldshtein, Aaron Leibowitz, Benjamin Leibowitz, David Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz.(Roche, Kyle)
November 26, 2019 Filing 39 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the Summons(ECF No. 7) and Complaint (ECF No. 1) with Exhibits 1-51 (ECf Nos. 1-1 through 1-51) mailed to Tether Limited c/o Proxy Secretarial Services Limited, ROOM 803 K. Wah Centre 191 Java Road, North Point, Hong Kong on 11/26/2019 by UPS tracking # 1Z 6Y2 F45 67 6301 2293, to the individual of the foreign state, pursuant to the provisions of FRCP 4(f)2(c)(ii). (smc) Modified on 12/3/2019 (smc).
November 26, 2019 Filing 38 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the Summons(ECF No. 7) and Complaint (ECF No. 1) with Exhibits 1-51 (ECf Nos. 1-1 through 1-51) mailed to Ludovicus Jan van der Velde at 27 Lo Wai Tsuen Pui O Lantau, Island, Hong Kong on 11/26/2019 by UPS tracking # 1Z 6Y2 F45 DG 9634 4523, to the individual of the foreign state, pursuant to the provisions of FRCP 4(f)2(c)(ii). (smc)
November 26, 2019 Filing 37 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the Summons(ECF No. 7) and Complaint (ECF No. 1) with Exhibits 1-51 ECf Nos. 1-1 through 1-51 mailed to Giancarlo Devasini at 87 Avenue Winston Churchill 06190 Roquebrune-Cap-Martin, France on 11/26/2019 by UPS tracking # 1Z 6Y2 F45 DG 9634 3426, to the individual of the foreign state, pursuant to the provisions of FRCP 4(f)2(c)(ii). (smc)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #35 Letter, filed by Aaron Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz, Pinchas Goldshtein, Benjamin Leibowitz, David Leibowitz. ENDORSEMENT: On November 15, Defendants Tether Holdings Limited, Tether Operations Limited, Tether International Limited, iFinex Inc., BFXNA Inc., BFXWW Inc., and DigFinex Inc. (together, "Corporate Defendants") filed a letter requesting leave to file a motion to dismiss. (Dkt. #28). Plaintiffs have replied to that letter indicating that they do not oppose the filing of a motion to dismiss. (Dkt. #35). Plaintiffs are directed to notify the Court on or before December 2, 2019: (i) whether they wish to amend their complaint in light of Defendants' pre-motion letter; and (ii) what steps they contemplate taking regarding the individual defendants that have not yet appeared in this action. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 11/20/2019) (kv)
November 20, 2019 Filing 35 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Kyle Roche dated 11/20/2019 re: 11/15/2019 Letter from Jim Walden (ECF No. 28). Document filed by Pinchas Goldshtein, Aaron Leibowitz, Benjamin Leibowitz, David Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz.(Roche, Kyle)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #30 Motion for Jason H. Kim to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of the Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at docket entry 30. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 11/20/2019) (kv)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #31 MOTION for Todd Michael Schneider to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at docket entry 31. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 11/20/2019) (jca)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #29 MOTION for Kyle Geoffrey Bates to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at docket entry 29. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 11/20/2019) (jca)
November 20, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #31 MOTION for Todd Michael Schneider to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18099575. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #29 MOTION for Kyle Geoffrey Bates to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number BNYSDC-18099312. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #30 MOTION for Jason H Kim to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18099548. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
November 19, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION for Todd Michael Schneider to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18099575. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Pinchas Goldshtein, Aaron Leibowitz, Benjamin Leibowitz, David Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit AFFIDAVIT OF TODD M. SCHNEIDER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE, #2 Text of Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE, #3 Certificate of Good Standing)(Schneider, Todd)
November 19, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for Jason H Kim to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18099548. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Pinchas Goldshtein, Aaron Leibowitz, Benjamin Leibowitz, David Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit AFFIDAVIT OF JASON H. KIM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE, #2 Text of Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE, #3 Certificate of Good Standing)(Kim, Jason)
November 19, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for Kyle Geoffrey Bates to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number BNYSDC-18099312. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Pinchas Goldshtein, Aaron Leibowitz, Benjamin Leibowitz, David Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit AFFIDAVIT OF KYLE G. BATES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE, #2 Text of Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE, #3 Certificate of Good Standing)(Bates, Kyle)
November 15, 2019 Filing 28 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Jim Walden dated 11/15/2019 re: Pre-Motion Letter for Permission to File Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by BFXNA Inc., BFXWW Inc., DigFinex Inc., Tether Holdings Limited, Tether International Limited, Tether Operations Limited, iFinex Inc..(Walden, James)
November 8, 2019 Filing 27 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Reginald Fowler served on 10/31/2019, answer due 11/21/2019. Service was accepted by Reginald Fowler. Document filed by Benjamin Leibowitz; David Leibowitz; Jason Leibowitz; Aaron Leibowitz; Pinchas Goldshtein. (Delich, Joseph)
November 8, 2019 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Philip G. Potter served on 10/22/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Benjamin Leibowitz; David Leibowitz; Jason Leibowitz; Aaron Leibowitz; Pinchas Goldshtein. (Delich, Joseph)
November 8, 2019 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. BFXNA Inc. served on 10/29/2019, answer due 11/19/2019; BFXWW Inc. served on 10/29/2019, answer due 11/19/2019; DigFinex Inc. served on 10/29/2019, answer due 11/19/2019; Tether Holdings Limited served on 10/29/2019, answer due 11/19/2019; Tether International Limited served on 10/29/2019, answer due 11/19/2019; Tether Operations Limited served on 10/29/2019, answer due 11/19/2019; iFinex Inc. served on 10/29/2019, answer due 11/19/2019. Service was accepted by Al-Shaddai Ramsarran. Document filed by Benjamin Leibowitz; David Leibowitz; Jason Leibowitz; Aaron Leibowitz; Pinchas Goldshtein. (Delich, Joseph)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #20 Motion for Sunjina K. Ahuja to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at docket entry 20. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 11/8/2019) (va) Modified on 11/19/2019 (va).
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #19 Motion for Michael Jason Lee to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at docket entry 19.(Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 11/8/2019) (va) Modified on 11/19/2019 (va).
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #21 Motion for Christopher J. Beal to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at docket entry 21. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 11/8/2019) (va) Modified on 11/19/2019 (va).
November 8, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #21 AMENDED MOTION for Christopher J. Beal to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Corrected Motion). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #19 AMENDED MOTION for Michael Jason Lee to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Corrected Motion). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #20 AMENDED MOTION for Sunjina K. Ahuja to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Corrected Motion). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
November 7, 2019 Filing 21 AMENDED MOTION for Christopher J. Beal to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Corrected Motion). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by BFXNA Inc., BFXWW Inc., DigFinex Inc., Tether Holdings Limited, Tether International Limited, Tether Operations Limited, iFinex Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher J. Beal, #2 Proposed Order)(Beal, Christopher)
November 7, 2019 Filing 20 AMENDED MOTION for Sunjina K. Ahuja to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Corrected Motion). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by BFXNA Inc., BFXWW Inc., DigFinex Inc., Tether Holdings Limited, Tether International Limited, Tether Operations Limited, iFinex Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sunjina K. Ahuja, #2 Proposed Order)(Ahuja, Sunjina)
November 7, 2019 Filing 19 AMENDED MOTION for Michael Jason Lee to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Corrected Motion). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by BFXNA Inc., BFXWW Inc., DigFinex Inc., Tether Holdings Limited, Tether International Limited, Tether Operations Limited, iFinex Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Jason Lee, #2 Proposed Order)(Lee, Michael)
November 4, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/7/2020 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 11/4/2019) (rro)
November 4, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephanie Tsay Levick on behalf of BFXNA Inc., BFXWW Inc., DigFinex Inc., Tether Holdings Limited, Tether International Limited, Tether Operations Limited, iFinex Inc.. (Levick, Stephanie)
November 4, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Arthur Cohen on behalf of BFXNA Inc., BFXWW Inc., DigFinex Inc., Tether Holdings Limited, Tether International Limited, Tether Operations Limited, iFinex Inc.. (Cohen, Daniel)
November 4, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Walden on behalf of BFXNA Inc., BFXWW Inc., DigFinex Inc., Tether Holdings Limited, Tether International Limited, Tether Operations Limited, iFinex Inc.. (Walden, James)
November 4, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #12 MOTION for Michael Jason Lee to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17879923. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #14 MOTION for Christopher J. Beal to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17880351. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #13 MOTION for Sunjina K. Ahuja to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17880317. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California. We do not except certificates from state bar of California.;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
November 1, 2019 Filing 14 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Christopher J. Beal to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17880351. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by BFXNA Inc., BFXWW Inc., DigFinex Inc., Tether Holdings Limited, Tether International Limited, Tether Operations Limited, iFinex Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher J. Beal, #2 Proposed Order)(Beal, Christopher) Modified on 11/4/2019 (bcu).
November 1, 2019 Filing 13 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Sunjina K. Ahuja to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17880317. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by BFXNA Inc., BFXWW Inc., DigFinex Inc., Tether Holdings Limited, Tether International Limited, Tether Operations Limited, iFinex Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sunjina K. Ahuja, #2 Proposed Order)(Ahuja, Sunjina) Modified on 11/4/2019 (bcu).
November 1, 2019 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Michael Jason Lee to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17879923. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by BFXNA Inc., BFXWW Inc., DigFinex Inc., Tether Holdings Limited, Tether International Limited, Tether Operations Limited, iFinex Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Jason Lee, #2 Proposed Order)(Lee, Michael) Modified on 11/4/2019 (bcu).
November 1, 2019 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE DOCUMENT #17) - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephanie Tsay Levick on behalf of BFXNA Inc., BFXWW Inc., Crypto Capital Corp., Giancarlo Devasini, DigFinex Inc., Reginald Fowler, Global Trade Solutions AG, Philip G. Potter, Tether Holdings Limited, Tether International Limited, Tether Limited, Tether Operations Limited, iFinex Inc., Ludovicus Jan van der Velde. (Levick, Stephanie) Modified on 11/4/2019 (ldi).
November 1, 2019 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE DOCUMENT #16) - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Arthur Cohen on behalf of BFXNA Inc., BFXWW Inc., Crypto Capital Corp., Giancarlo Devasini, DigFinex Inc., Reginald Fowler, Global Trade Solutions AG, Philip G. Potter, Tether Holdings Limited, Tether International Limited, Tether Limited, Tether Operations Limited, iFinex Inc., Ludovicus Jan van der Velde. (Cohen, Daniel) Modified on 11/4/2019 (ldi).
November 1, 2019 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE DOCUMENT #15) - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Walden on behalf of BFXNA Inc., BFXWW Inc., Crypto Capital Corp., Giancarlo Devasini, DigFinex Inc., Reginald Fowler, Global Trade Solutions AG, Philip G. Potter, Tether Holdings Limited, Tether International Limited, Tether Limited, Tether Operations Limited, iFinex Inc., Ludovicus Jan van der Velde. (Walden, James) Modified on 11/4/2019 (ldi).
October 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kyle William Roche on behalf of Pinchas Goldshtein, Aaron Leibowitz, Benjamin Leibowitz, David Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz. (Roche, Kyle)
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to BFXNA Inc., BFXWW Inc., Crypto Capital Corp., Giancarlo Devasini, DigFinex Inc., Reginald Fowler, Global Trade Solutions AG, Philip G. Potter, Tether Holdings Limited, Tether International Limited, Tether Limited, Tether Operations Limited, iFinex Inc., Ludovicus Jan van der Velde. (dnh)
October 8, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #6 AMENDED MOTION for Devin (Velvel) Freedman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Corrected Motion). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED MOTION for Devin (Velvel) Freedman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Corrected Motion). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Pinchas Goldshtein, Aaron Leibowitz, Benjamin Leibowitz, David Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Devin (Velvel) Freedman, #2 Exhibit D.C. Court of Appeal Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Freedman, Devin)
October 7, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #5 MOTION for Devin Freedman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Florida Supreme Court;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (aea)
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Devin Freedman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Pinchas Goldshtein, Aaron Leibowitz, Benjamin Leibowitz, David Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Devin Freedman in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A - DC Bar Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Freedman, Devin) Modified on 10/7/2019 (aea).
October 7, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #4 MOTION for Devin Freedman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17729368. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Florida Supreme Court; Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (aea)
October 7, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Devin Freedman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17729368. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Pinchas Goldshtein, Aaron Leibowitz, Benjamin Leibowitz, David Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Florida Bar Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit of Devin Freedman in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #3 Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Freedman, Devin) Modified on 10/7/2019 (aea).
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to IFINEX INC., BFXNA INC., BFXWW INC., TETHER HOLDINGS LIMITED, TETHER OPERATIONS LIMITED, TETHER LIMITED, TETHER INTERNATIONAL LIMITED, DIGFINEX INC., PHILIP G. POTTER, GIANCARLO DEVASINI, LUDOVICUS JAN VAN DER VELDE, REGINALD FOWLER, CRYPTO CAPITAL CORP., and GLOBAL TRADE SOLUTIONS AG, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,. Document filed by Pinchas Goldshtein, Aaron Leibowitz, Benjamin Leibowitz, David Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz. (Delich, Joseph)
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Delich, Joseph)
October 7, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
October 7, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
October 7, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
October 7, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Joseph Michael Delich. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
October 7, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Joseph Michael Delich. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: BFXNA Inc., BFXWW Inc., Crypto Capital Corp., Giancarlo Devasini, DigFinex Inc., Reginald Fowler, Global Trade Solutions AG, Philip G. Potter, Tether Holdings Limited, Tether International Limited, Tether Limited, Tether Operations Limited, iFinex Inc., Ludovicus Jan van der Velde, Benjamin Leibowitz, David Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz, Aaron Leibowitz, Pinchas Goldshtein. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly. (dnh)
October 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BFXNA Inc., BFXWW Inc., Crypto Capital Corp., Giancarlo Devasini, DigFinex Inc., Reginald Fowler, Global Trade Solutions AG, Philip G. Potter, Tether Holdings Limited, Tether International Limited, Tether Limited, Tether Operations Limited, iFinex Inc., Ludovicus Jan van der Velde. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17724400)Document filed by Benjamin Leibowitz, David Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz, Aaron Leibowitz, Pinchas Goldshtein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51)(Delich, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leibowitz et al v. iFinex Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BFXNA Inc.
Represented By: James Walden
Represented By: Christopher Beal
Represented By: Stephanie Tsay Levick
Represented By: Michael Jason Lee
Represented By: Sunjina Kaur Ahuja
Represented By: Daniel Arthur Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tether International Limited
Represented By: James Walden
Represented By: Christopher Beal
Represented By: Stephanie Tsay Levick
Represented By: Michael Jason Lee
Represented By: Sunjina Kaur Ahuja
Represented By: Daniel Arthur Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ludovicus Jan van der Velde
Represented By: James Walden
Represented By: Christopher Beal
Represented By: Stephanie Tsay Levick
Represented By: Sunjina Kaur Ahuja
Represented By: Daniel Arthur Cohen
Represented By: Michael Jason Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tether Holdings Limited
Represented By: James Walden
Represented By: Christopher Beal
Represented By: Stephanie Tsay Levick
Represented By: Michael Jason Lee
Represented By: Sunjina Kaur Ahuja
Represented By: Daniel Arthur Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: iFinex Inc.
Represented By: James Walden
Represented By: Christopher Beal
Represented By: Stephanie Tsay Levick
Represented By: Michael Jason Lee
Represented By: Sunjina Kaur Ahuja
Represented By: Daniel Arthur Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip G. Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tether Limited
Represented By: James Walden
Represented By: Christopher Beal
Represented By: Stephanie Tsay Levick
Represented By: Sunjina Kaur Ahuja
Represented By: Daniel Arthur Cohen
Represented By: Michael Jason Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crypto Capital Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reginald Fowler
Represented By: Michael C. Hefter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tether Operations Limited
Represented By: James Walden
Represented By: Christopher Beal
Represented By: Stephanie Tsay Levick
Represented By: Michael Jason Lee
Represented By: Sunjina Kaur Ahuja
Represented By: Daniel Arthur Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giancarlo Devasini
Represented By: James Walden
Represented By: Christopher Beal
Represented By: Stephanie Tsay Levick
Represented By: Sunjina Kaur Ahuja
Represented By: Daniel Arthur Cohen
Represented By: Michael Jason Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DigFinex Inc.
Represented By: James Walden
Represented By: Christopher Beal
Represented By: Stephanie Tsay Levick
Represented By: Michael Jason Lee
Represented By: Sunjina Kaur Ahuja
Represented By: Daniel Arthur Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Trade Solutions AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BFXWW Inc.
Represented By: James Walden
Represented By: Christopher Beal
Represented By: Stephanie Tsay Levick
Represented By: Michael Jason Lee
Represented By: Sunjina Kaur Ahuja
Represented By: Daniel Arthur Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Leibowitz
Represented By: Devin Freedman
Represented By: Joseph Michael Delich
Represented By: Kyle William Roche
Represented By: Todd Michael Schneider
Represented By: Jason H Kim
Represented By: Kyle G. Bates
Represented By: Constantine Philip Economides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pinchas Goldshtein
Represented By: Devin Freedman
Represented By: Joseph Michael Delich
Represented By: Kyle William Roche
Represented By: Todd Michael Schneider
Represented By: Jason H Kim
Represented By: Kyle G. Bates
Represented By: Constantine Philip Economides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Leibowitz
Represented By: Devin Freedman
Represented By: Joseph Michael Delich
Represented By: Kyle William Roche
Represented By: Todd Michael Schneider
Represented By: Jason H Kim
Represented By: Kyle G. Bates
Represented By: Constantine Philip Economides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Leibowitz
Represented By: Devin Freedman
Represented By: Joseph Michael Delich
Represented By: Kyle William Roche
Represented By: Todd Michael Schneider
Represented By: Jason H Kim
Represented By: Kyle G. Bates
Represented By: Constantine Philip Economides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Leibowitz
Represented By: Devin Freedman
Represented By: Joseph Michael Delich
Represented By: Kyle William Roche
Represented By: Todd Michael Schneider
Represented By: Jason H Kim
Represented By: Kyle G. Bates
Represented By: Constantine Philip Economides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?