Francis v. Saul
Plaintiff: Shamar Daquam Francis
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2019cv09257
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: James L Cott
Referring Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Allison Rovner on behalf of Andrew M. Saul. (Rovner, Allison)
October 16, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Andrew M. Saul served on 10/16/2019, answer due 11/6/2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Shamar Daquam Francis. (Hurwitz, Miriam)
October 11, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Andrew M. Saul. (pc)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the briefing schedule will be modified as follows, superseding the Order issued by Judge Woods dated October 9, 2019 (Dkt. No. 8): 1.the defendant shall, within 90 days after service, file the certified transcript of the administrative proceedings, which shall constitute the defendant's answer, or otherwise move against the complaint; as further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 10/11/2019) (cf)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Requests for an extension of any of the dates set forth herein must be made in accordance with the Court's Individual Rule 1(E). In addition, if the Commissioner anticipates that the Commissioner will require an extension of the date by which it must file a motion for judgment on the pleadings, any other motion, or a stipulation of remand to the Commissioner, the Commissioner should request the extension no less than two business days prior to the filing of the e-CAR and answer or other responsive pleading. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 10/9/2019) (ks)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Social Security. Referred to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 10/9/2019) (ks)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. See 28 U.S.C. 1915. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 10/9/2019) (rjm)
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Andrew M. Saul, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Shamar Daquam Francis. (Hurwitz, Miriam)
October 8, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
October 8, 2019 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
October 8, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
October 8, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Miriam Leala Hurwitz to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Each party's name that is written on the summons must be listed on the docket entry for the summons;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
October 7, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Shamar Daquam Francis. (Hurwitz, Miriam) Modified on 10/8/2019 (pc).
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Shamar Daquam Francis.(Hurwitz, Miriam)
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Hurwitz, Miriam)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul. Document filed by Shamar Daquam Francis. (Attachments: #1 AC Denial)(Hurwitz, Miriam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Francis v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Allison Rovner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shamar Daquam Francis
Represented By: Miriam Leala Hurwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?