De los Santos Comonfort et al v. Services Mangia, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ricardo De los Santos Comonfort
Defendant: Joanna Sasha & Friends Food SVC Inc., Silvia Doe, Sasha Muniak, Pawell Koszalka, Margaret Doe, Mangia 57, Inc. and Services Mangia, Inc.
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Ricardo De los Santos
Case Number: 1:2019cv09262
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Michael Antonio Faillace to RE-FILE Document No. #10 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the defendant name listed on the Summons PDF and in the request docket entry text must appear exactly as it does in the caption on the pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
December 3, 2019 Filing 22 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Silvia Doe. (dnh)
December 3, 2019 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Services Mangia, Inc.. (dnh)
December 3, 2019 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sasha Muniak. (dnh)
December 3, 2019 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Pawell Koszalka. (dnh)
December 3, 2019 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Margaret Doe. (dnh)
December 3, 2019 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mangia 57, Inc.. (dnh)
November 27, 2019 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Silvia Doe, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Ricardo De los Santos Comonfort, Ricardo De los Santos Comonfort. (Faillace, Michael)
November 27, 2019 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Services Mangia, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Ricardo De los Santos Comonfort, Ricardo De los Santos Comonfort. (Faillace, Michael)
November 27, 2019 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sasha Muniak, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Ricardo De los Santos Comonfort, Ricardo De los Santos Comonfort. (Faillace, Michael)
November 27, 2019 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Pawell Koszalka, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Ricardo De los Santos Comonfort, Ricardo De los Santos Comonfort. (Faillace, Michael)
November 27, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Margaret Doe, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Ricardo De los Santos Comonfort, Ricardo De los Santos Comonfort. (Faillace, Michael)
November 27, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mangia 57, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Ricardo De los Santos Comonfort, Ricardo De los Santos Comonfort. (Faillace, Michael)
November 27, 2019 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Joanna Sasha & Friends Food SVC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Ricardo De los Santos Comonfort, Ricardo De los Santos Comonfort. (Faillace, Michael) Modified on 12/3/2019 (dnh).
October 8, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Michael Antonio Faillace to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons, #9 Request for Issuance of Summons, #3 Request for Issuance of Summons, #6 Request for Issuance of Summons, #7 Request for Issuance of Summons, #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #8 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): plaintiff name contains a typographical error on caption entered on summons request PDF; party name must appear exactly as it does on pleading caption. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pne)
October 8, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Michael Antonio Faillace. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Ricardo De los Santos Comonfort. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party role was entered incorrectly. (pne)
October 8, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
October 8, 2019 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
October 8, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
October 7, 2019 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Silvia Doe, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Ricardo De los Santos, Ricardo De los Santos Comonfort. (Faillace, Michael) Modified on 10/8/2019 (pne).
October 7, 2019 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Margaret Doe, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Ricardo De los Santos, Ricardo De los Santos Comonfort. (Faillace, Michael) Modified on 10/8/2019 (pne).
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Pawell Koszalka, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Ricardo De los Santos, Ricardo De los Santos Comonfort. (Faillace, Michael) Modified on 10/8/2019 (pne).
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sasha Muniak, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Ricardo De los Santos, Ricardo De los Santos Comonfort. (Faillace, Michael) Modified on 10/8/2019 (pne).
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Joanna Sasha & Friends Food SVC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Ricardo De los Santos, Ricardo De los Santos Comonfort. (Faillace, Michael) Modified on 10/8/2019 (pne).
October 7, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mangia 57, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Ricardo De los Santos, Ricardo De los Santos Comonfort. (Faillace, Michael) Modified on 10/8/2019 (pne).
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Services Mangia, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Ricardo De los Santos, Ricardo De los Santos Comonfort. (Faillace, Michael) Modified on 10/8/2019 (pne).
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Faillace, Michael)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Margaret Doe, Silvia Doe, Joanna Sasha & Friends Food SVC Inc., Pawell Koszalka, Mangia 57, Inc., Sasha Muniak, Services Mangia, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17729382)Document filed by Ricardo De los Santos, Ricardo De los Santos Comonfort.(Faillace, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: De los Santos Comonfort et al v. Services Mangia, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joanna Sasha & Friends Food SVC Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silvia Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sasha Muniak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pawell Koszalka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mangia 57, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Services Mangia, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Ricardo De los Santos
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo De los Santos Comonfort
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?