Nunez et al v. Cross Bronx and Across New York Live Poultry Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Euripides Frias Nunez
Defendant: Abraham Elzeinab, Ibrahim Simreen and Cross Bronx and Across New York Live Poultry Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv09293
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Abraham Elzeinab.(Morrison, Arthur)
December 2, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 1/7/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (cf)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Application GRANTED. The December 3, 2019, conference is adjourned until January 7, 2020, at 10:30 a.m. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 12/2/2019) (cf)
December 1, 2019 Filing 16 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Consent addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield dated Arthur Morrison,Esq. Document filed by Cross Bronx and Across New York Live Poultry Inc., Abraham Elzeinab, Ibrahim Simreen. Return Date set for 12/3/2019 at 10:00 AM.(Morrison, Arthur)
November 26, 2019 Filing 15 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Euripides Frias Nunez(Individually), Euripides Frias Nunez(On behalf of all others similarly situated). (Avshalumov, Roman)
November 26, 2019 Filing 14 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from All Parties dated November 26, 2019 re: Joint Initial Conference Letter. Document filed by Euripides Frias Nunez(Individually), Euripides Frias Nunez(On behalf of all others similarly situated).(Avshalumov, Roman)
November 13, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Cross Bronx and Across New York Live Poultry Inc., Abraham Elzeinab, Ibrahim Simreen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affirmation of Service by ECF on 11/13/19)(Morrison, Arthur)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application GRANTED. All Defendants' answers are due by December 3, 2019. Cross Bronx and Across New York Live Poultry Inc. answer due 12/3/2019; Abraham Elzeinab answer due 12/3/2019; Ibrahim Simreen answer due 12/3/2019 (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 11/13/2019) (cf)
November 12, 2019 Filing 11 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Arthur Morrison, dated November 12, 2019. Document filed by Cross Bronx and Across New York Live Poultry Inc., Abraham Elzeinab, Ibrahim Simreen. Return Date set for 12/3/2019 at 05:00 PM.(Morrison, Arthur)
November 7, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Abraham Elzeinab served on 10/28/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. Service was accepted by Abraham Elzeinab. Document filed by Euripides Frias Nunez(Individually); Euripides Frias Nunez(On behalf of all others similarly situated). (Avshalumov, Roman)
November 5, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Ibrahim Simreen served on 10/23/2019, answer due 11/13/2019. Service was accepted by Ibrahim Simreen, Officer auth. to accept. Document filed by Euripides Frias Nunez(Individually); Euripides Frias Nunez(On behalf of all others similarly situated). (Avshalumov, Roman)
November 5, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Cross Bronx and Across New York Live Poultry Inc. served on 10/23/2019, answer due 11/13/2019. Service was accepted by Ibrahim Simreen, Officer auth. to accept. Document filed by Euripides Frias Nunez(Individually); Euripides Frias Nunez(On behalf of all others similarly situated). (Avshalumov, Roman)
October 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Patrick Peter O'Donnell on behalf of Euripides Frias Nunez(Individually), Euripides Frias Nunez(On behalf of all others similarly situated). (O'Donnell, James)
October 28, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of October 18, 2019 Court Order and Court's Individual Rules served on Cross Bronx and Across New York Live Poultry Inc.; Ibrahim Simreen; Abraham Elzeinab on 10/28/19. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Euripides Frias Nunez(Individually), Euripides Frias Nunez(On behalf of all others similarly situated). (Avshalumov, Roman)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 12/3/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 1106, Thurgood Marshal Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.(As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/18/2019) (cf)
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cross Bronx and Across New York Live Poultry Inc., Abraham Elzeinab, Ibrahim Simreen. (jgo) (Main Document 4 replaced on 10/9/2019) (jgo).
October 9, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
October 9, 2019 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
October 9, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Cross Bronx and Across New York Live Poultry Inc.; Ibrahim Simreen; Abraham Elzeinab, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Euripides Frias Nunez(Individually), Euripides Frias Nunez(On behalf of all others similarly situated). (Avshalumov, Roman)
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Avshalumov, Roman)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cross Bronx and Across New York Live Poultry Inc., Abraham Elzeinab, Ibrahim Simreen. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17734948)Document filed by Euripides Frias Nunez(Individually), Euripides Frias Nunez(On behalf of all others similarly situated).(Avshalumov, Roman)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nunez et al v. Cross Bronx and Across New York Live Poultry Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abraham Elzeinab
Represented By: Arthur Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ibrahim Simreen
Represented By: Arthur Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cross Bronx and Across New York Live Poultry Inc.
Represented By: Arthur Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Euripides Frias Nunez
Represented By: Roman Mikhail Avshalumov
Represented By: James Patrick Peter O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?