Chavaloc Choror et al v. Abitino's Pizza 49th Street Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Renato Lopez Sayaman and Pedro Giddel Chavaloc Choror
Defendant: Mario Abitino, Jr., Mario Abitino, Salvador Abitino, Abitino's Pizza & Restaurant Inc. No. II, Abitino's Pizza 49th Street Corp. and Dominique Abitino
Case Number: 1:2019cv09297
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Mario Abitino, Jr served on 10/22/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. Service was accepted by Salvador Abitino - Co-worker, auth. to accept. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Pedro Giddel Chavaloc Choror; Renato Lopez Sayaman. (Avshalumov, Roman)
October 29, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Dominique Abitino served on 10/22/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. Service was accepted by Salvador Abitino - Co-worker, auth. to accept. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Pedro Giddel Chavaloc Choror; Renato Lopez Sayaman. (Avshalumov, Roman)
October 29, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Salvador Abitino served on 10/18/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. Service was accepted by Salvador Abitino. Document filed by Pedro Giddel Chavaloc Choror; Renato Lopez Sayaman. (Avshalumov, Roman)
October 29, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Mario Abitino served on 10/22/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. Service was accepted by Salvador Abitino - Co-worker, auth. to accept. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Pedro Giddel Chavaloc Choror; Renato Lopez Sayaman. (Avshalumov, Roman)
October 29, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Abitino's Pizza 49th Street Corp. served on 10/18/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. Service was accepted by Salvador Abitino - Managing agent, auth. to accept. Document filed by Pedro Giddel Chavaloc Choror; Renato Lopez Sayaman. (Avshalumov, Roman)
October 29, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Abitino's Pizza & Restaurant Inc. No. II served on 10/18/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. Service was accepted by Salvador Abitino - Managing agent, auth. to accept. Document filed by Pedro Giddel Chavaloc Choror; Renato Lopez Sayaman. (Avshalumov, Roman)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. (As further set forth in this Order.) The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 10/11/2019) (cf)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 2/5/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 15D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Analisa Torres. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 10/11/2019) (cf)
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dominique Abitino, Mario Abitino, Jr, Mario Abitino, Salvador Abitino, Abitino's Pizza & Restaurant Inc. No. II, Abitino's Pizza 49th Street Corp.. (sj)
October 9, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Roman Mikhail Avshalumov. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Abitino's Pizza 49th Street Corp.; Abitino Pizza & Restaurant, Inc. No. II. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party type was entered incorrectly. (sj)
October 9, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Roman Mikhail Avshalumov. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Queens. (sj)
October 9, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
October 9, 2019 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
October 9, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Abitino's Pizza 49th Street Corp.; Abitino Pizza & Restaurant Inc. No. II; Mario Abitino; Salvador Abitino; Dominique Abitino; Mario Abitino, Jr., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Pedro Giddel Chavaloc Choror, Renato Lopez Sayaman. (Avshalumov, Roman)
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Avshalumov, Roman)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dominique Abitino, Mario Abitino, Jr, Mario Abitino, Salvador Abitino, Abitino's Pizza & Restaurant Inc. No. II, Abitino's Pizza 49th Street Corp.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17735852)Document filed by Pedro Giddel Chavaloc Choror, Renato Lopez Sayaman.(Avshalumov, Roman)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chavaloc Choror et al v. Abitino's Pizza 49th Street Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renato Lopez Sayaman
Represented By: Roman Mikhail Avshalumov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Giddel Chavaloc Choror
Represented By: Roman Mikhail Avshalumov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mario Abitino, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mario Abitino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salvador Abitino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abitino's Pizza & Restaurant Inc. No. II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abitino's Pizza 49th Street Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominique Abitino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?