Bowers v. Racher Press, Inc.
Plaintiff: Eric Bowers
Defendant: Racher Press, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv09313
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis A Kaplan
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: By letter dated November 25, 2019 the parties informed chambers that this case has been settled. Accordingly, the case is dismissed with prejudice and without costs subject to right to reinstate by serving and filing a notice to that effect on or before, January 2, 2020, if the settlement is not executed by then. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 12/2/2019) (jca)
November 25, 2019 Filing 13 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from R. Terry Parker dated 11/25/2019 re: Settlement. Document filed by Eric Bowers.(Parker, Robert)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CONSENT SCHEDULING ORDER: No additional parties may be joined after January 24, 2020. No amendments to the pleadings will be permitted after January 24, 2020. All discovery, including any depositions of experts, shall be completed on or before April 20, 2020. A joint pretrial order in the form prescribed in Judge Kaplan's individual rules shall be filed on or before May 18, 2020. (As further set forth in this Order.) Amended Pleadings due by 1/24/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 1/24/2020. Deposition due by 4/20/2020. Discovery due by 4/20/2020. Pretrial Order due by 5/18/2020. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 11/18/2019) (cf)
November 15, 2019 Filing 11 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Document filed by Eric Bowers. (Parker, Robert)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application GRANTED, although to clarify: Defendant has until Monday, December 4, 2019, to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman Part I on 10/31/2019) Racher Press, Inc. answer due 12/4/2019 (ks)
October 29, 2019 Filing 9 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, Letter Motion addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Robert S. Cohen, Esq. dated October 29, 2019. Document filed by Racher Press, Inc..(Cohen, Robert)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE SCHEDULING AND INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Counsel receiving this order shall promptly mail copies hereof to all other counsel of record or, in the case of parties for which no appearance has been made, to such parties. (And as further set forth herein.) Initial Conference set for 11/26/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 21B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 10/24/2019) (jca)
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Racher Press, Inc. served on 10/10/2019, answer due 10/31/2019. Service was accepted by Arianna J., Receptionist. Document filed by Eric Bowers. (Parker, Robert)
October 9, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Racher Press, Inc.. (dnh)
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (dnh)
October 9, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
October 9, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
October 9, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Racher Press, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Eric Bowers. (Parker, Robert)
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Parker, Robert)
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Parker, Robert)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Racher Press, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17738706)Document filed by Eric Bowers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Original image, #2 Exhibit B - Registration Certificate, #3 Exhibit C - Screenshots, #4 Exhibit D - proof of ownership)(Parker, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowers v. Racher Press, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Racher Press, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Stephen Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Bowers
Represented By: Robert Terry Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?