Rodriguez-Batista v. United States of America
Petitioner: Yessenia Maria Rodriguez-Batista
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv09421
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1651cn
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Yessenia Maria Rodriguez-Batista ID No. 352537918 A 041 298 391, at 11 Hillside Avenue Apt. 4J New York, NY 10040, on 10/17/2019 Re: #3 Order to Answer, via REGULAR MAIL. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a flyer about the free legal assistance clinic located in the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse (only in non prisoner cases), a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge, a form for you to complete if you consent to receive filings electronically (only in nonprisoner cases). (bwa)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO ANSWER PETITION FOR WRIT OF ERROR CORAM NOBIS: Petitioner brings this application, styled as a Motion to Withdraw Guilty Plea. The Court construes this application as a petition for a writ of error coram nobis. Having concluded that the petition should not be summarily dismissed as being without merit, the Court ORDERS that: The Clerk of Court shall electronically notify the Criminal Division of the U.S. Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New York that this order has been issued. Within sixty days of the date of this order, the U.S. Attorney's Office shall file an answer or other pleading in response to the petition. Petitioner shall have thirty days from the date on which Petition is served with Respondent's answer to file a response. Absent further order, the matter will be considered fully submitted as of that date. All further papers filed or submitted for filing must include the criminal docket number and will be docketed in the criminal case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 10/14/2019) (ama) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing.
October 3, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:01-cr-00977-GHW. (sac)
October 3, 2019 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sac)
October 3, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sac)
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF CORAM NOBIS against United States of America. Document filed by Yessenia Maria Rodriguez-Batista. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez-Batista v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Yessenia Maria Rodriguez-Batista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?