Farmer v. Shake Shack Enterprises, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Dawashia Farmer
Defendant: Shake Shack Enterprises, LLC, Damon Cordova, Shake Shack 152 E 88 LLC and Shake Shack 152 E 86 LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv09425
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #11 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Attorney Erica Sanders terminated.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 11/15/2019) (jwh)
November 15, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Erica Sanders to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Dawashia Farmer.(Filippatos, Parisis)
November 1, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jordan Elliot Pace on behalf of Damon Cordova, Shake Shack 152 E 86 LLC, Shake Shack Enterprises, LLC. (Pace, Jordan)
November 1, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Carolyn Diane Richmond on behalf of Damon Cordova, Shake Shack 152 E 86 LLC, Shake Shack Enterprises, LLC. (Richmond, Carolyn)
October 30, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Shake Shack Enterprises, LLC waiver sent on 10/11/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. Document filed by Dawashia Farmer. (Filippatos, Parisis)
October 30, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Shake Shack 152 E 88 LLC waiver sent on 10/11/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. Document filed by Dawashia Farmer. (Filippatos, Parisis)
October 30, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Damon Cordova waiver sent on 10/11/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. Document filed by Dawashia Farmer. (Filippatos, Parisis)
October 17, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so redesignated. (wb)
October 17, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Judge Vincent L. Briccetti is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Damon Cordova, Shake Shack 152 E 88 LLC, Shake Shack Enterprises, LLC. (pc)
October 15, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
October 15, 2019 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
October 15, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
October 15, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Parisis G. Filippatos. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Office code Foley Square;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Office code has been modified to White Plains;. (pc)
October 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Erica Sanders on behalf of Dawashia Farmer. (Sanders, Erica)
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Shake Shack Enterprises, LLC, Shake Shack 152 E 86 LLC, and Damon Cordova, individually, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Dawashia Farmer. (Filippatos, Parisis)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Filippatos, Parisis)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Damon Cordova, Shake Shack 152 E 88 LLC, Shake Shack Enterprises, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17756709)Document filed by Dawashia Farmer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Filippatos, Parisis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farmer v. Shake Shack Enterprises, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shake Shack Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Jordan Elliot Pace
Represented By: Carolyn Diane Richmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damon Cordova
Represented By: Jordan Elliot Pace
Represented By: Carolyn Diane Richmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shake Shack 152 E 88 LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shake Shack 152 E 86 LLC
Represented By: Jordan Elliot Pace
Represented By: Carolyn Diane Richmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawashia Farmer
Represented By: Erica Sanders
Represented By: Parisis G. Filippatos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?