Ramani v. YouTube LLC
Plaintiff: Valmiki D. Ramani
Defendant: YouTube LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv09499
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Request for Copies/Transcripts/Docket Sheet Processed: Mailed copy of Docket Sheet to Valmiki D. Ramani 139-05 85 Dr. 6B Briarwood, NY 11435 on 12/5/2019. (nb)
December 4, 2019 Request for Copy of the updated Docket Sheet Received: Re #7 Letter. Request for Docket Report, from V. Ramani received on 12/4/19. Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc)
December 4, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER from Valmiki Ramani, re: (DISCOVERY) - Plaintiff informs the Court that he was forced to delete and remove his channel from YouTube, although the defendant still maintains the channel name, VALMIKI RAMANI INTERNATIONAL SONGS OF LOVE; as when typed into their browser it leads to the site of his former channel etc. Document filed by Valmiki D. Ramani.(sc)
November 22, 2019 Received e-mail from the United States District Court - Northern District of California acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 4:19-cv-07261, filed on 11/19/2019. (sjo)
November 13, 2019 Mailed a copy of #6 Order, to Valmiki D. Ramani 139-05 85 Dr. 6B Briarwood, NY 11435. (vba)
November 12, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Northern District of California. (rjm)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TRANSFER ORDER. The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. The Clerk of Court is further directed to assign this matter to my docket, mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, and note service on the docket. Whether Plaintiff should be permitted to proceed further without prepayment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. A summons shall not issue from this Court. This order closes this case. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). The Clerk of Court is directed to docket this as a "written opinion" within the meaning of Section 205(a)(5) of the E-Government Act of 2002. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/12/2019) (rjm) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing.
November 12, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (rjm)
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER from V. Ramani, re:(DISCOVERY)- Plaintiff writes to the Court that the defendant reused his videos from 427 to 5 under his channel's name; and the plaintiff was forced to delete his channel. Document filed by Valmiki D. Ramani.(sc) Modified on 11/6/2019 (sc).
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from V. Ramani, re: Plaintiff informs the Court that he has filed this lawsuit after he was forced to delete his channel on 10/11/19, because YouTube had reduced his video from H24 to 5; and that the entire page and channel were now Indian videos. Document filed by Valmiki D. Ramani.(sc)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Mr. Valmiki D. Romani re: On this 11th day of October 2019 it is with the most sadness, I have to inform you the my Youtube channel which at 70 years of age, was all I had in life to keep me pridict, after three years, I had to delete it. Document filed by Valmiki D. Ramani.(rdz)
October 15, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against YouTube LLC. Document filed by Valmiki D. Ramani.(rdz)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Valmiki D. Ramani.(rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramani v. YouTube LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valmiki D. Ramani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YouTube LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?