Reddy v. Abitbol et al
Petitioner: Deepika Reddy
Respondent: Corporation Y, DOES 1-10, Gilles R. R. Abitbol, Esq., Bond, Shoeneck & King, PLLC, Abitbol, Cherry & Salanic, LLP, Amy Cherry-Abitbol, Joseph M. Finnerty, Esq., Corporation X., Douglas M. McRae, Esq. and Pierre N. Abitbol
Case Number: 1:2019cv09509
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Received e-mail from the United States District Court - Northern District of New York acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 5:19-cv-01493, filed on 12/4/2019. (sjo)
November 22, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Northern District of New York (rro)
November 22, 2019 Mailed a copy of #19 Order, to Deepika Reddy, 7338 Dartmoor Crossing, Fayetteville, NY 13066. (tn)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Accordingly, this action is hereby ORDERED transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of New York pursuant, to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 11/21/2019) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (rro) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing.
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application GRANTED. The named Defendants time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is hereby tolled until such further order of the Court. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 11/20/2019) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (kv)
November 20, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Appearance and Letter to Judge Polk Failla served on Petitioner and Respondents on November 20, 2019. Service was made by ECF on Petitioner and Mail on Respondents. Document filed by Bond, Shoeneck & King, PLLC, Douglas M. McRae, Esq. (Siegel, Arthur)
November 20, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time (respectfully request that the time for the Respondents to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Petitioners Complaint be tolled until such further Order of the Court) addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Arthur J. Siegel dated November 20, 2019. Document filed by Bond, Shoeneck & King, PLLC, Douglas M. McRae, Esq.(Siegel, Arthur)
November 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Arthur John Siegel on behalf of Bond, Shoeneck & King, PLLC, Douglas M. McRae, Esq. (Siegel, Arthur)
November 19, 2019 Filing 17 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from D. Reddy, dated 11/14/19 re: Plaintiff writes letter in response to the Court's Order dated 10/16/19; and states that the Southern District of New York has subject matter jurisdiction under 28:1331 and 28:1367; and plaintiff claims violations of the RICO Act, 18P: 1962 (c) etc. Document filed by Deepika Reddy.(sc)
November 19, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint, served. Abitbol, Cherry & Salanic, LLP served on 11/7/2019, answer due 11/29/2019. Service was accepted by Arbitol, Cherry & Salanik(person's name not given). Document filed by Deepika Reddy. (sc)
November 19, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint, served. Amy Cherry-Abitbol served on 11/7/2019, answer due 11/29/2019. Service was accepted by Amy Cherry-Arbitol. Document filed by Deepika Reddy. (sc)
November 19, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint, served. Bond, Shoeneck & King, PLLC served on 11/11/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. Service was accepted by Bond, Schoeneck & King(person's name not given). Document filed by Deepika Reddy. (sc)
November 19, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint, served. Pierre N. Abitbol served on 11/7/2019, answer due 11/29/2019. Service was accepted by Pierre Arbitol. Document filed by Deepika Reddy. (sc)
November 19, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint, served. Joseph M. Finnerty, Esq. served on 11/8/2019, answer due 11/29/2019. Service was accepted by Joseph Finnerty. Document filed by Deepika Reddy. (sc)
November 19, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint, served. Douglas M. McRae, Esq served on 11/12/2019, answer due 12/3/2019. Service was accepted by Douglas McRae. Document filed by Deepika Reddy. (sc)
November 19, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint, served. Gilles R. R. Abitbol, Esq served on 11/8/2019, answer due 11/29/2019. Service was accepted by Gilles R.R. Arbitol. Document filed by Deepika Reddy. (sc)
November 19, 2019 Filing 6 PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Deepika Reddy consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Deepika Reddy.(sc)
October 17, 2019 Mailed a copy of #5 Order to Show Cause, to Deepika Reddy, 7338 Dartmoor Crossing, Fayetteville, NY 13066. (tn)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Accordingly, Plaintiff is ORDERED to show cause in writing, on or before November 15, 2019, why the Court should not transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of New York pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). To the extent that any defendant is served and appears in this case before that date, that defendant may, but is not required to, respond to this Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 10/16/2019) (kv)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Deepika Reddy at 7338 Dartmoor CrossingFayetteville, NY 13066 on 10/16/2019. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a flyer about the free legal assistance clinic located in the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse (only in non prisoner cases), a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge, a form for you to complete if you consent to receive filings electronically (only in nonprisoner cases), one or more summonses (only if you have paid the fee in person or if the judge has ordered that a summons be issued to you) - 10 copies of Summons(es) mailed. (rdz) (nb).
October 11, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Gilles R. R. Abitbol, Esq, Pierre N. Abitbol, Abitbol, Cherry & Salanic, LLP, Bond, Shoeneck & King, PLLC, Amy Cherry-Abitbol, Corporation X., Corporation Y, DOES 1-10, Joseph M. Finnerty, Esq, Douglas M. McRae, Esq. (rdz)
October 11, 2019 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (rdz)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 RICO STATEMENT for Declaratory and Injunctive relief and Damages from Racketeering, Conspiracy to engage in a pattern of Racketeering activity and related claims. Document filed by Deepika Reddy.(rdz)
October 11, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gilles R. R. Abitbol, Esq, Pierre N. Abitbol, Abitbol, Cherry & Salanic, LLP, Bond, Shoeneck & King, PLLC, Amy Cherry-Abitbol, Corporation X., Corporation Y, DOES 1-10, Joseph M. Finnerty, Esq, Douglas M. McRae, Esq. (Filing Fee $ $400.00, Receipt Number 465401246076)Document filed by Deepika Reddy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reddy v. Abitbol et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Corporation Y
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Gilles R. R. Abitbol, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bond, Shoeneck & King, PLLC
Represented By: Arthur John Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Abitbol, Cherry & Salanic, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Amy Cherry-Abitbol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Joseph M. Finnerty, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Corporation X.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Douglas M. McRae, Esq.
Represented By: Arthur John Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Pierre N. Abitbol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Deepika Reddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?