United States of America v. Doonan et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: William Doonan and Associates, Inc. d/b/a William Doonan, Esq., William Doonan and William Doonan and Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv09578
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7407
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. GRANTED. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for December 16, 2019 is ADJOURNED to January 6, 2020, at 12:20 p.m. By December 30, 2019, the parties shall submit their joint letter and proposed case management plan. Initial Conference set for 1/6/2020 at 12:20 PM before Judge Analisa Torres. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 12/12/2019) (mro)
December 9, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by William Doonan.(sc)
December 3, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference and Response to Court's Order Regarding Consenting to a Magistrate Judge addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Charles S. Jacob dated December 3, 2019. Document filed by United States of America.(Jacob, Charles)
October 23, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. William Doonan waiver sent on 10/18/2019, answer due 12/17/2019; William Doonan and Associates, Inc. waiver sent on 10/18/2019, answer due 12/17/2019. Document filed by United States of America. (Jacob, Charles)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, counsel for Defendants shall, by December 9, 2019, email a fully executed Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form, available at http://nysd.uscomis.gov/file/forms/consent-to-proceed-before-usmagistrate-judge and attached to this order, to Orders_and_Judgments@nysd.uscourts.gov. If the Court approves that form, all further proceedings will then be conducted before the assigned Magistrate Judge rather than before me. An information sheet on proceedings before magistrate judges is also attached to this order. Any appeal would be taken directly to the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, as it would be if the consent form were not signed and so ordered. If any party does not consent to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, the parties must file a joint letter, by December 9, 2019, advising the Court that the parties do not consent, but without disclosing the identity of the party or parties who do not consent. The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 10/17/19) (yv)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 12/16/2019 at 11:40 AM in Courtroom 15D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Analisa Torres, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 10/17/2019) (jwh)
October 17, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
October 17, 2019 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
October 17, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Jacob, Charles)
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against William Doonan, William Doonan and Associates, Inc. d/b/a William Doonan, Esq.. Document filed by United States of America.(Jacob, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Doonan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Doonan and Associates, Inc. d/b/a William Doonan, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Doonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Doonan and Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Charles Salim Jacob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?