Vera v. NBCUniversal Media, LLC
Plaintiff: Marianela Vera
Defendant: NBCUniversal Media, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv09586
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by NBCUniversal Media, LLC.(Lerner, Mark)
December 9, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Comcast Corporation for NBCUniversal Media, LLC. Document filed by NBCUniversal Media, LLC.(Lerner, Mark)
November 22, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Initial Conference set for 1/16/2020 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 14A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John G. Koeltl. (Fletcher, Donnie)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned attorneys that the time for defendant to answer, move or otherwise respond to plaintiff's Complaint in the above action is extended through and including December 9, 2019. In entering this Stipulation, Defendant NBCUniversal Media, LLC expressly reserves, and waives none, of its rights, arguments or objections in this matter. So ordered. NBCUniversal Media, LLC answer due 12/9/2019. Motions terminated: #5 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Mark Lerner dated November 4, 2019. Document filed by NBCUniversal Media, LLC. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 11/4/2019) (rjm)
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Mark Lerner dated November 4, 2019. Document filed by NBCUniversal Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulation and Proposed Order for Extension of Time)(Lerner, Mark)
October 17, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Liebowitz, Richard)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to NBCUniversal Media, LLC. (dnh)
October 17, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
October 17, 2019 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
October 17, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
October 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz to submit a completed AO 121 Form Copyright to court for review. Use the event type AO 121 Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
October 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NBCUniversal Media, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Marianela Vera. (Liebowitz, Richard)
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NBCUniversal Media, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17785522)Document filed by Marianela Vera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vera v. NBCUniversal Media, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marianela Vera
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NBCUniversal Media, LLC
Represented By: Mark Alan Lerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?