McGucken v. Newsweek LLC et al
Plaintiff: Elliot McGucken
Defendant: Newsweek LLC and Does 1-10, inclusive,
Case Number: 1:2019cv09617
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #14 Letter filed by Elliot McGucken. ENDORSEMENT: The Court is in receipt of Defendant's request for a pre-motion conference (Dkt. #13), and Plaintiff's opposing letter (Dkt. #14). Having reviewed the parties' submissions, the Court believes that a pre-motion conference is warranted. Therefore, the Court ORDERS the parties to appear before the Court for a pre-motion conference on January 7, 2020, at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 618 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. Furthermore, the initial pretrial conference originally scheduled for February 20, 2020, is hereby ADJOURNED sine die. (Pre-Motion Conference set for 1/7/2020 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/11/2019) (rro)
December 11, 2019 Filing 14 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Scott Alan Burroughs dated December 11, 2019 re: Defendant's Request for Pre-Motion Conference. Document filed by Elliot McGucken.(Burroughs, Scott)
December 6, 2019 Filing 13 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Nancy E. Wolff dated December 6, 2019 re: Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Newsweek LLC.(Wolff, Nancy)
November 15, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lindsay Rebecca Edelstein on behalf of Newsweek LLC. (Edelstein, Lindsay)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Application GRANTED. The deadline to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is hereby extended to December 6, 2019. (Newsweek LLC answer due 12/6/2019.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 11/14/2019) (rro)
November 14, 2019 Filing 10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Nancy E. Wolff dated 11/4/2019. Document filed by Newsweek LLC.(Wolff, Nancy)
November 14, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nancy Evelyn Wolff on behalf of Newsweek LLC. (Wolff, Nancy)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE:This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on February 20, 2020, at 2:30 p.m., in Courtroom 618 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 2/20/2020 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 11/13/2019) (ama)
October 28, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Newsweek LLC served on 10/25/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. Service was accepted by Manny Lam. Document filed by Elliot McGucken. (Burroughs, Scott)
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Newsweek LLC. (dnh)
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (dnh)
October 18, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
October 18, 2019 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
October 18, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
October 17, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Newsweek LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Elliot McGucken. (Burroughs, Scott)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Burroughs, Scott)
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Burroughs, Scott)
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Does 1-10, inclusive,, Newsweek LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17791987)Document filed by Elliot McGucken.(Burroughs, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGucken v. Newsweek LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newsweek LLC
Represented By: Lindsay Rebecca Edelstein
Represented By: Nancy Evelyn Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elliot McGucken
Represented By: Scott Alan Burroughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?