Keith v. Barstool Sports, Inc.
Plaintiff: Stephanie Keith
Defendant: Barstool Sports, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv09620
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 12/09/2019) (ama)
December 6, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Barstool Sports, Inc..(Werbin, Barry)
December 5, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Alexander Field on behalf of Barstool Sports, Inc.. (Field, Daniel)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Aaron J. Moss to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (Daniels, Anthony)
November 6, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #11 MOTION for Aaron J. Moss to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17901279. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
November 5, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Aaron J. Moss to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17901279. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Barstool Sports, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit to Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Moss, Aaron)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application granted. The deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to December 6, 2019. SO ORDERED. Barstool Sports, Inc. answer due 12/6/2019. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 10/30/2019) (ama)
October 30, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint or to move or otherwise respond addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Document filed by Barstool Sports, Inc..(Werbin, Barry)
October 29, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Barstool Sports, Inc..(Werbin, Barry)
October 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Barry Werbin on behalf of Barstool Sports, Inc.. (Werbin, Barry)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court at the time and place listed below. DUE DATE OF JOINT LETTER and PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: February 4, 2020. DATE AND PLACE OF CONFERENCE: February 11, 2020 at 3:15 p.m. in Courtroom 12C of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Daniel Patrick Moynihan U.S. Courthouse at 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, 10007. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 2/11/2020 at 03:15 PM in Courtroom 12C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 10/18/2019) (ama)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that this case is referred for mediation to the Court-annexed Mediation Program. The parties are hereby notified that Local Rule 83.9 shall govern the mediation and are directed to participate in the mediation in good faith. The mediation should take place at least two weeks prior to the Initial Pretrial Conference, which is currently scheduled for February 11, 2020 at 3:15 p.m. by separate Order to be entered today. The mediation will have no effect upon any scheduling Order issued by this Court without leave of this Court. Mediators will be assigned based on the nature of suit. Additional expertise requests should promptly be directed to the Mediation Office. SO ORDERED. Please reference the following when corresponding with the Mediation Office. E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone (212) 805-0643, and facsimile (212) 805-0647. Mediator to be Assigned by 10/28/2019. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 10/18/2019) (ama)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Liebowitz, Richard)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Barstool Sports, Inc.. (dnh)
October 18, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
October 18, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
October 18, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
October 18, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz to submit a completed AO 121 Form Copyright to court for review. Use the event type AO 121 Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
October 18, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Barstool Sports, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Stephanie Keith. (Liebowitz, Richard)
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Barstool Sports, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17792465)Document filed by Stephanie Keith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keith v. Barstool Sports, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barstool Sports, Inc.
Represented By: Barry Werbin
Represented By: Daniel Alexander Field
Represented By: Aaron J. Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Keith
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?