Savor Health, LLC v. Day
Plaintiff: SAVOR HEALTH, LLC, and Savor Health, LLC
Defendant: ANDREA DAY
Case Number: 1:2019cv09798
Filed: October 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a conference proceeding held on 11/8/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 11/8/2019 before Judge Ronnie Abrams. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela Utter, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/31/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/10/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/9/2020.(McGuirk, Kelly)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Kerry E. Connolly dated 11/15/2019 re: List of Files in Ex Savor Health Folder on laptop. Document filed by Andrea Day.(Connolly, Kerry)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Andrea Day waiver sent on 11/8/2019, answer due 1/7/2020. Document filed by Savor Health, LLC. (Boyer, Nana)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: As discussed on the record at today's conference, the parties have jointly stipulated that Ms. Day will comply with her Employee Covenants Agreement during the pendency of this litigation and that any violation of that Agreement will constitute a violation of this order. Ms. Day has also agreed to file an itemized list of all documents saved in the "ex Savor Health Admin" folder with the names of Savor's clients redacted within one week. Savor's motion for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction is therefore denied as moot. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 11/08/2019) (ama)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronnie Abrams: Status Conference held on 11/8/2019. (Court Reporter Pam Utter) (arc)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kerry E. Connolly on behalf of Andrea Day. (Connolly, Kerry)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: The parties shall appear for a conference before the Court on November 8, 2019, at 11:45 a.m., in Courtroom 1506 at the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York 10007. At this conference, the parties shall be prepared to discuss their objections to the proposal in the Court's October 31, 2019 Order. SO ORDERED. Status Conference set for 11/8/2019 at 11:45 AM in Courtroom 1506, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 11/5/2019) (rj)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Kerry E. Connolly dated 11/4/2019 re: Proposed Order. Document filed by Andrea Day. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Screenshot 1, #2 Exhibit Screenshot 2)(Connolly, Kerry)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Nana Boyer, Esq. dated 11/4/2019 re: 10/31/2019 Order (Dkt. 11). Document filed by Savor Health, LLC.(Boyer, Nana)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Order (Doc. 11) served on Andrea Day on 10/31/2019. Document filed by Savor Health, LLC. (Boyer, Nana)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: This Court held a telephone conference on October 29, 2019 during which it directed the parties to attempt to reach and file a joint stipulation and proposed order that would bar Ms. Day from violating her contractual obligations to Savor Health, LLC during the pendency of this litigation. On October 29, Savor filed a letter stating that the parties were unable to agree to the terms of a joint stipulation and proposed order. See Dkt. 9. On October 30, Ms. Day filed a letter objecting to Savor's proposed stipulation on the grounds that it modifies material terms of the Employee Covenants Agreement she had previously signed, including by excising a provision permitting the use of "Confidential Information" in connection with a court, administrative, or other governmental proceeding. See Dkt. 10. In light of the fact that Ms. Day has already signed two certifications of compliance with the terms of her Employee Covenants Agreement and has agreed to stipulate to the same, see Dkt. 9-2, the Court proposes issuing an Order stating that Ms. Day will comply with all terms of her Employee Covenants Agreement during the pendency of this litigation. The parties shall file letters no later than November 4, 2019 asserting any objections to this proposal. Savor shall serve a copy of this Order on Ms. Day and file proof of such service on the docket. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 10/31/2019) (rj)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Kerry E. Connolly dated 10/30/2019 re: Plaintiff's requested injunction. Document filed by Andrea Day.(Connolly, Kerry)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Nana Boyer, Esq. dated October 29, 2019 re: Injunctive relief sought by Plaintiff. Document filed by Savor Health, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Proposed Stipulation, #2 Exhibit Defendant's Proposed Stipulation, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Boyer, Nana)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronnie Abrams: Telephone Conference held on 10/29/2019. (arc)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Kerry E. Connolly dated 10/28/2019 re: Plaintiff's Proposed TRO. Document filed by Andrea Day.(Connolly, Kerry)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nana Boyer on behalf of Savor Health, LLC. (Boyer, Nana)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeremy Andrew Berman on behalf of Savor Health, LLC. (Berman, Jeremy)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Andrea Day. (pne)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Steven Cooper. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Savor Health, LLC, Andrea Day. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (pne)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (pne)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Andrea Day, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by SAVOR HEALTH, LLC,. (Cooper, Steven)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by SAVOR HEALTH, LLC,.(Cooper, Steven)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Cooper, Steven)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANDREA DAY. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17823058)Document filed by SAVOR HEALTH, LLC,.(Cooper, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Savor Health, LLC v. Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREA DAY
Represented By: Kerry E. Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAVOR HEALTH, LLC,
Represented By: Steven Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Savor Health, LLC
Represented By: Steven Cooper
Represented By: Nana Boyer
Represented By: Jeremy Andrew Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?