Getty Images (US), Inc. v. Bronstein et al
Plaintiff: Getty Images (US), Inc.
Defendant: Andrew Bronstein and Mark Grether
Case Number: 1:2019cv09804
Filed: October 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332ct
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel for Plaintiff and Defendant Andrew Bronstein: Plaintiff has served the summons and complaint upon defendant Bronstein and Bronstein waives any defense concerning lack of service of process. The time for defendant Bronstein to respond to the complaint is hereby extended up to and including Tuesday, January 7, 2020. (Andrew Bronstein answer due 1/7/2020.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 12/19/2019) (jwh)
December 17, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Norman Knuts on behalf of Andrew Bronstein. (Knuts, Robert)
December 17, 2019 Filing 16 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Andrew Bronstein. (Knuts, Robert)
December 17, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Andrew Bronstein served on 11/18/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. Document filed by Getty Images (US), Inc.. (Eisenberg, Gary)
December 10, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Mark Grether served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. Service was accepted by Mark Grether. Document filed by Getty Images (US), Inc.. (Eisenberg, Gary)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #12 Motion for Jeri Leigh Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 11/1/2019) (ks)
October 29, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #12 MOTION for Jeri Leigh Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
October 29, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Jeri Leigh Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Getty Images (US), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jeri Leigh Miller in Support, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Miller, Jeri)
October 29, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #9 MOTION for Jeri Leigh Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17851561. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Texas;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
October 29, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mark Grether. (dnh)
October 29, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Andrew Bronstein. (dnh)
October 29, 2019 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Jeri Leigh Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17851561. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Getty Images (US), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jeri Leigh Miller, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Miller, Jeri) Modified on 10/29/2019 (bcu).
October 28, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Defendant Mark Grether, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Getty Images (US), Inc.. (Eisenberg, Gary)
October 28, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Defendant Andrew Bronstein, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Getty Images (US), Inc.. (Eisenberg, Gary)
October 28, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Gary Frederick Eisenberg to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Include 'c/o' or 'via' before second party names. For example, Andrew Bronstein c/o Vector Capital. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/18/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/25/2019) (jwh)
October 25, 2019 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mark Grether, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Getty Images (US), Inc.. (Eisenberg, Gary) Modified on 10/28/2019 (dnh).
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Andrew Bronstein, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Getty Images (US), Inc.. (Eisenberg, Gary) Modified on 10/28/2019 (dnh).
October 24, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
October 24, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
October 24, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
October 24, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Gary Frederick Eisenberg. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (sj)
October 24, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Getty Images, Inc. for Getty Images (US), Inc.. Document filed by Getty Images (US), Inc..(Eisenberg, Gary)
October 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Eisenberg, Gary)
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Bronstein, Mark Grether. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17823712)Document filed by Getty Images (US), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Eisenberg, Gary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Getty Images (US), Inc. v. Bronstein et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Bronstein
Represented By: Robert Norman Knuts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Grether
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Getty Images (US), Inc.
Represented By: Gary Frederick Eisenberg
Represented By: Jeri Leigh Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?