Sutherland v. Long Island Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Ryan Sutherland
Defendant: Long Island Railroad Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv09848
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Eastern District of New York (cf)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #7 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Ryan Sutherland. ENDORSEMENT: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's consent to transfer of this action to the Eastern District of New York. The Court therefore ORDERS that this action be so transferred. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/10/2019) (cf) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing.
December 9, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: #5 Order to Show Cause,. Document filed by Ryan Sutherland. (Wietzke, Marc)
November 22, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Long Island Railroad Company waiver sent on 10/28/2019, answer due 12/27/2019. Document filed by Ryan Sutherland. (Wietzke, Marc)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Accordingly, Plaintiff is ORDERED to show cause in writing, on or before December 13, 2019, why the Court should not transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). To the extent that Defendant is served and appears in this case before that date, Defendant may, but is not required to, respond to this Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 11/12/2019) (rro)
October 25, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Marc Twyman Wietzke. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Nassau. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Queens. (pne)
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Long Island Railroad Company. (pne)
October 25, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
October 25, 2019 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
October 25, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
October 24, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Wietzke, Marc)
October 24, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Long Island Railroad Company, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ryan Sutherland. (Wietzke, Marc)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Long Island Railroad Company. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17830261)Document filed by Ryan Sutherland.(Wietzke, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sutherland v. Long Island Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long Island Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Sutherland
Represented By: Marc Twyman Wietzke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?