A2 Realty Group, LLC v. Wonderama Holdings, LLC
Plaintiff: A2 Realty Group, LLC
Defendant: Wonderama Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv09901
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Initial Conference set for 1/30/2020 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 14A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John G. Koeltl. (Fletcher, Donnie)
December 2, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Wonderama Holdings, LLC waiver sent on 10/28/2019, answer due 12/27/2019. Document filed by A2 Realty Group, LLC. (Peters, Geoffrey)
November 21, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Wonderama Holdings, LLC. (dnh)
November 21, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Wonderama Holdings, LLC. (dnh)
November 20, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Wonderama Holdings, LLC, c/o Corporation Trust CO., Registered Agent, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by A2 Realty Group, LLC. (Peters, Geoffrey)
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Wonderama Holdings, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by A2 Realty Group, LLC. (Peters, Geoffrey)
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Peters, Geoffrey)
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by A2 Realty Group, LLC.(Peters, Geoffrey)
October 28, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
October 28, 2019 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
October 28, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
October 28, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Geoffrey James Peters. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $174000;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to none;. (jgo)
October 28, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Geoffrey James Peters to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Citizenship Defendant code - multiple selections selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Peters, Geoffrey) Modified on 10/28/2019 (jgo).
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wonderama Holdings, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17835807)Document filed by A2 Realty Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Promissory Note & Amended and Restated Promissory Note)(Peters, Geoffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A2 Realty Group, LLC v. Wonderama Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A2 Realty Group, LLC
Represented By: Geoffrey James Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wonderama Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?