Dikambi v. City University of New York et al
Plaintiff: Judith Sandrine Dikambi
Defendant: Dr. Carlton J. Adams and City University of New York
Case Number: 1:2019cv09937
Filed: October 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Carlton J. Adams. (dnh)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City University of New York. (dnh)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Carlton J. Adams, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Judith Sandrine Dikambi. (Jones, Lisa)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City University of New York, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Judith Sandrine Dikambi. (Jones, Lisa)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Jones, Lisa)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Lisa A. Jones to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons, #3 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): no district court selection was made on the top of the summons request PDF; do not attach other documents to the summons request. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the summons form PDF. (pne)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Lisa A. Jones to RE-FILE Document. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF.. (pne)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Lisa A. Jones. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jury Demand code n (None); Dollar Demand None; County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jury Demand code has been modified to p (Plaintiff); the Dollar Demand has been modified to $300,000; the County code has been modified to New York. (pne)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (pne)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Lisa A. Jones. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Judith Sandrine Dikambi, Carlton J. Adams. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (pne)
October 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Dr Carlton J Adams, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by JUDITH SANDRINE DIKAMBI. (Jones, Lisa) Modified on 10/28/2019 (pne).
October 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City University of New York, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by JUDITH SANDRINE DIKAMBI. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover sheet)(Jones, Lisa) Modified on 10/28/2019 (pne).
October 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CARLTON J ADAMS, City University of New York. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17840931)Document filed by JUDITH SANDRINE DIKAMBI.(Jones, Lisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dikambi v. City University of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Sandrine Dikambi
Represented By: Lisa A. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Carlton J. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City University of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?