West v. Action Network Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Joseph H West and Joseph H. West
Defendant: The Action Network, Paul Lo Duca and Action Network, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv09970
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1441nr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 CASE REMANDED OUT from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the State Court - Supreme Court Court of the State of New York, County of New York. Sent certified copy of docket entries and remand order. Mailed via UPS Tracking Number 1Z E22 E53 22 1002 925 6 on 10/30/2019. (mml)
October 30, 2019 Filing 5 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #4 Letter filed by Action Network, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: The Notice of Removal is withdrawn by defendant and the case is remanded to the Court from which it was removed. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/30/2019) (mml) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
October 30, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Jeffrey Landis dated October 30, 2019 re: Withdraw its Notice of Removal. Document filed by Action Network, Inc..(Landis, Jeffrey)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #2 Letter filed by Action Network, Inc.. ENDORSEMENT: Your letter is very confusing, are you trying to withdraw your notice of removal? SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/29/2019) (kv)
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Jeffrey Landis dated October 29, 2019 re: notice of removal. Document filed by Action Network, Inc..(Landis, Jeffrey)
October 29, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
October 29, 2019 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
October 29, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Colleen McMahon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
October 29, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jeffrey Landis to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Pursuant to Rule 13.3, exhibits to pleading must be labeled (i.e. Summons and Complaint). Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (dnh)
October 29, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jeffrey Landis. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: The Action Network. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (dnh)
October 29, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Jeffrey Landis. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - EXHIBITS NOT CLEARLY TITLED-NOTICE OF REMOVAL from NY Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 160250/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17849216).Document filed by The Action Network. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Landis, Jeffrey) Modified on 10/29/2019 (dnh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West v. Action Network Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Action Network
Represented By: Jeffrey Landis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Lo Duca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Action Network, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Landis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph H West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph H. West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?