CVS Pharmacy, Inc. et al v. Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., et al
Plaintiff: Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.,, CVS Pharmacy, Inc. and Rite Aid Corporation
Defendant: Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Astrazeneca L.P., Astrazeneca UK Limited, Accord Healthcare, Inc., Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P.,
Case Number: 1:2019cv09999
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Filing 36 DECLARATION of Colette T. Connor in Support re: #34 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , or in the alternative. MOTION to Transfer Case .. Document filed by Astrazeneca L.P., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P.,, Astrazeneca UK Limited, Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Frackman, Andrew)
December 23, 2019 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #34 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , or in the alternative. MOTION to Transfer Case . . Document filed by Astrazeneca L.P., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P.,, Astrazeneca UK Limited, Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Frackman, Andrew)
December 23, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , or in the alternative., MOTION to Transfer Case . Document filed by Astrazeneca L.P., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P.,, Astrazeneca UK Limited, Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Frackman, Andrew)
December 23, 2019 Filing 33 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc for Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Document filed by Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Frackman, Andrew)
December 23, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Jay Frackman on behalf of Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Frackman, Andrew)
December 23, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brett Johnston Williamson on behalf of Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Williamson, Brett)
December 23, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Carolyn Suzanne Wall on behalf of Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Wall, Carolyn)
December 23, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #27 MOTION for Christina Elyse Fahmy to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18344706. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #26 MOTION for Peter Michael Boyle to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18335856. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
December 23, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Document filed by Accord Healthcare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Lang, Thomas)
December 23, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to 12(b)(6). Document filed by Accord Healthcare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lang, Thomas)
December 23, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Christina Elyse Fahmy to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18344706. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Accord Healthcare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of C. Fahmy in support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit District of Columbia Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit PA Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Affidavit of Service)(Brandofino, Keith)
December 20, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Peter Michael Boyle to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18335856. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Accord Healthcare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit New York Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit New Jersey Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Exhibit District of Columbia Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Brandofino, Keith)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE in case 1:19-cv-07233-CM; granting (18) Motion for Caitlin V. McHugh to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-09999-CM. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/19/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-07233-CM, 1:19-cv-09999-CM (mml)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE in case 1:19-cv-07233-CM; granting (17) Motion for Chelsea M. Nichols to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-09999-CM. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/19/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-07233-CM, 1:19-cv-09999-CM. (mml)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #16 Motion for Barry L. Refsin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/19/2019) (mml)
December 18, 2019 Filing 22 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Intas Pharmaceuticals Ltd. for Accord Healthcare, Inc.. Document filed by Accord Healthcare, Inc..(Lang, Thomas)
December 18, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Feldman on behalf of Accord Healthcare, Inc.. (Feldman, William)
December 18, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas J. Lang on behalf of Accord Healthcare, Inc.. (Lang, Thomas)
December 18, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas J. Lang on behalf of Accord Healthcare, Inc.. (Lang, Thomas)
November 22, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #17 MOTION for Chelsea M. Nichols to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18129471. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #16 MOTION for Barry L. Refsin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18129100. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #18 MOTION for Caitlin V. McHugh to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18129577. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
November 22, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Caitlin V. McHugh to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18129577. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.,. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing (PA), #3 Certificate of Good Standing (NJ), #4 Text of Proposed Order)(McHugh, Caitlin)
November 22, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Chelsea M. Nichols to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18129471. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.,. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Nichols, Chelsea)
November 22, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #16 MOTION for Barry L. Refsin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18129100. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
November 22, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Barry L. Refsin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18129100. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.,. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing (PA), #3 Certificate of Good Standing (NJ), #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Refsin, Barry)
November 12, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC waiver sent on 10/29/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. Document filed by Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.,; Rite Aid Corporation; CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Egervary, Alexander)
November 11, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 10/29/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. Document filed by Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.,; Rite Aid Corporation; CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Egervary, Alexander)
November 8, 2019 CASE ASSOCIATED: Create association to 1:19-cv-07233-CM. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/08/2019) (NAP)
November 7, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric L Bloom on behalf of CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.,. (Bloom, Eric)
November 7, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Monica L Kiley on behalf of CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.,. (Kiley, Monica)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #7 Motion for Eric L. Bloom to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/5/2019) (rro)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #6 Motion for Monica L. Kiley to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/5/2019) (rro)
November 4, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Astrazeneca L.P. waiver sent on 10/29/2019, answer due 12/30/2019; Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., waiver sent on 10/29/2019, answer due 12/30/2019; Astrazeneca UK Limited waiver sent on 10/29/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. Document filed by Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.,; Rite Aid Corporation; CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Egervary, Alexander)
November 4, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Accord Healthcare, Inc. waiver sent on 10/29/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. Document filed by Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.,; Rite Aid Corporation; CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Egervary, Alexander)
November 4, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #7 MOTION for Eric L. Bloom to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17889957. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
November 4, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Eric L. Bloom to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17889957. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.,. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Eric L. Bloom, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Bloom, Eric)
November 4, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #6 MOTION for Monica L. Kiley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17889566. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
November 4, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Monica L. Kiley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17889566. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.,. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Monica L. Kiley, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Kiley, Monica)
October 31, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb)
October 31, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
October 31, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:19-cv-07233-CM. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
October 30, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Colleen McMahon as possibly related to 19-cv-7233. (jgo)
October 30, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
October 30, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (jgo)
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. Document filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.,.(Egervary, Alexander)
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 19-cv-8296 (CM). Document filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.,.(Egervary, Alexander)
October 29, 2019 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 19-cv-7233 (CM). Document filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.,.(Egervary, Alexander)
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Egervary, Alexander)
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Accord Healthcare, Inc., Astrazeneca L.P., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P.,, Astrazeneca UK Limited, Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17851562)Document filed by Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.,, Rite Aid Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc..(Egervary, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CVS Pharmacy, Inc. et al v. Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astrazeneca L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astrazeneca UK Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accord Healthcare, Inc.
Represented By: William Feldman
Represented By: Keith Michael Brandofino
Represented By: Thomas J. Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Jay Frackman
Represented By: Brett Johnston Williamson
Represented By: Carolyn Suzanne Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.,
Represented By: Alexander John Egervary
Represented By: Barry Refsin
Represented By: Monica L Kiley
Represented By: Caitlin McHugh
Represented By: Chelsea Nichols
Represented By: Eric L Bloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander John Egervary
Represented By: Barry Refsin
Represented By: Monica L Kiley
Represented By: Caitlin McHugh
Represented By: Chelsea Nichols
Represented By: Eric L Bloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rite Aid Corporation
Represented By: Alexander John Egervary
Represented By: Barry Refsin
Represented By: Monica L Kiley
Represented By: Caitlin McHugh
Represented By: Chelsea Nichols
Represented By: Eric L Bloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?