Petroleos De Venezuela S.A. et al v. MUFG Union Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: PDVSA Petroleo S.A., Petroleos De Venezuela S.A. and PDV Holding, Inc.
Defendant: MUFG Union Bank, N.A. and GLAS Americas LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv10023
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Zachary Kaye on behalf of GLAS Americas LLC, MUFG Union Bank, N.A.. (Kaye, Zachary)
January 8, 2020 Filing 44 ANSWER to #40 Counterclaim. Document filed by PDV Holding, Inc..(Korn, Jeffrey)
January 8, 2020 Filing 43 ANSWER to #40 Counterclaim. Document filed by PDVSA Petroleo S.A., Petroleos De Venezuela S.A..(Worthington, James)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER APPROVING WITHDRAWAL F THREE CROWNS LLP AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS re: #41 Notice (Other) filed by GLAS Americas LLC, MUFG Union Bank, N.A., IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: The Application to Withdraw as Counsel by Luke Sobota and the law firm of Three Crowns LLP is hereby GRANTED. Luke Sobota is hereby withdrawn and discharged as counsel for the Defendants in this case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT: Luke Sobota, whose email address is luke.sobota@threecrownsllp.com, is removed from the mailing matrix and from receiving CM/ECF electronic filings in this case. Attorney Luke Sobota terminated. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/20/2019) (rj)
December 19, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Application of Withdrawal. Document filed by GLAS Americas LLC, MUFG Union Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sobota, Luke)
December 18, 2019 Filing 40 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,., COUNTERCLAIM against PDV Holding, Inc., PDVSA Petroleo S.A., Petroleos De Venezuela S.A.. Document filed by MUFG Union Bank, N.A., GLAS Americas LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PDVSA Offering Circular (2016), #2 Exhibit B - Supplement to Offering Circular, #3 Exhibit C - PDVSA 2020 Bond Indenture, #4 Exhibit D - Pledge and Security Agreement, #5 Exhibit E - Ad Hoc Press Release)(Clark, Christopher)
December 18, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew S Salerno on behalf of GLAS Americas LLC, MUFG Union Bank, N.A.. (Salerno, Matthew)
December 18, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher J. Clark on behalf of GLAS Americas LLC, MUFG Union Bank, N.A.. (Clark, Christopher)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #36 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Application GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (GLAS Americas LLC answer due 12/18/2019; MUFG Union Bank, N.A. answer due 12/18/2019.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/13/2019) (rro)
December 12, 2019 Filing 36 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint,, addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Jonathan Hurwitz dated December 12, 2019. Document filed by GLAS Americas LLC, MUFG Union Bank, N.A..(Hurwitz, Jonathan)
December 4, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nathan Philip Eimer on behalf of PDV Holding, Inc.. (Eimer, Nathan)
November 27, 2019 Filing 34 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent MUFG Bank, Ltd., Corporate Parent MUFG Americas Holding Corporation, Corporate Parent Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc. for MUFG Union Bank, N.A.. Document filed by MUFG Union Bank, N.A..(Hurwitz, Jonathan)
November 27, 2019 Filing 33 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Global Loan Agency Services Ltd. for GLAS Americas LLC. Document filed by GLAS Americas LLC.(Hurwitz, Jonathan)
November 19, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a conference proceeding held on 11/8/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
November 19, 2019 Filing 31 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 11/8/2019 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela Utter, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/10/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/20/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/18/2020.(McGuirk, Kelly)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #29 Letter filed by Petroleos De Venezuela S.A., PDVSA Petroleo S.A. ENDORSEMENT: The Court is in receipt of the parties' proposed schedule and will so order it. The parties are directed to appear before the Court for oral argument on their summary judgment motions on May 5, 2020, at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 618 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. SO ORDERED. (Deposition due by 3/20/2020, Motions due by 4/1/2020, Responses due by 4/21/2020, Replies due by 4/30/2020, Oral Argument set for 5/5/2020 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 11/15/2019) (jca)
November 15, 2019 Filing 29 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from James R. Bliss dated 11/15/2019 Document filed by PDVSA Petroleo S.A., Petroleos De Venezuela S.A..(Worthington, James)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #26 Letter filed by Petroleos De Venezuela S.A., PDVSA Petroleo S.A. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 11/15/2019) (rro)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #22 Motion for Luke Andrew Sobota to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 11/15/2019) (rro)
November 15, 2019 Filing 26 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from James R. Bliss dated 11/15/2019 Document filed by PDVSA Petroleo S.A., Petroleos De Venezuela S.A..(Worthington, James)
November 14, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shane Donnelly Avidan on behalf of GLAS Americas LLC, MUFG Union Bank, N.A.. (Avidan, Shane)
November 14, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Hillel Hurwitz on behalf of GLAS Americas LLC, MUFG Union Bank, N.A.. (Hurwitz, Jonathan)
November 14, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Walter Rieman on behalf of GLAS Americas LLC, MUFG Union Bank, N.A.. (Rieman, Walter)
November 14, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #22 MOTION for Luke Andrew Sobota to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
November 14, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Luke Andrew Sobota to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by GLAS Americas LLC, MUFG Union Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Luke Andrew Sobota in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #3 Appendix Certificates of Good Standing - Luke Sobota (updated))(Sobota, Luke)
November 8, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Katherine Polk Failla: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/8/2019. Attorneys James Robert Bliss, James B. Worthington and Kurt Wayne Hansson representing Plaintiffs Petroleos De Venezuela S.A. and PDVSA Petroleo S.A. present. Attorneys Jeffrey B. Korn and Tariq Mundiya representing Plaintiff PDV Holding Inc. present. Attorneys Luke Sobota, Kimberly Larkin, Jonathan H. Hurwitz and Walter Rieman representing Defendants present. Attorney Sobota's pro hac vice application is Granted. By 12:00 p.m. on 11/15/2019, the parties are to submit a letter with an agreed upon schedule, or informing the Court that a schedule could not be agreed to. A copy of today's transcript is to be ordered. (See transcript). (Court Reporter Pamela Utter) (tn)
November 8, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #19 MOTION for Luke Andrew Sobota to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17923400. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from SUPREME COURT STATE OF CALIFORNIA;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (vba)
November 7, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Julian Gottlieb on behalf of PDV Holding, Inc.. (Gottlieb, Michael)
November 7, 2019 Filing 20 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Luke Andrew Sobota dated November 7, 2019 re: Response to Expedited Scheduling. Document filed by GLAS Americas LLC, MUFG Union Bank, N.A..(Sobota, Luke)
November 7, 2019 Filing 19 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Luke Andrew Sobota to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17923400. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by GLAS Americas LLC, MUFG Union Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Luke Andrew Sobota in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #3 Certificates of Good Standing)(Sobota, Luke) Modified on 11/8/2019 (vba).
November 7, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Order on Joint Letter Motion for Conference served on MUFG Union Bank, N.A. on 11/6/2019. Service was accepted by Pensom Upsom Sopakit, Teller. Document filed by PDVSA Petroleo S.A., Petroleos De Venezuela S.A.. (Bliss, James)
November 7, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Order on Joint Letter Motion for Conference served on GLAS Americas LLC on 11/6/2019. Service was accepted by Martin Reed, Senior Vice President. Document filed by PDVSA Petroleo S.A., Petroleos De Venezuela S.A.. (Bliss, James)
November 6, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 11/7/2019 (kv)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Letter Motion for Conference. The Court is in receipt of Plaintiffs' letter of November 6, 2019 (Dkt. #15). The Court recognizes the urgency of Plaintiffs' request and therefore ORDERS the parties to appear before the Court for a hearing on November 8, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 618 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. The Court further ORDERS Defendants to respond by letter to Plaintiffs' proposed expedited schedule no later than end of day on November 7, 2019. As there is still no notice of appearance by Defendants' counsel, the Court directs Plaintiffs to serve a copy of this endorsement on Defendants by end of day today, November 6, 2019. SO ORDERED. Status Conference set for 11/8/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 11/6/2019) (kv)
November 6, 2019 Filing 15 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from James R. Bliss dated November 6, 2019. Document filed by PDVSA Petroleo S.A., Petroleos De Venezuela S.A..(Bliss, James)
November 5, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. GLAS Americas LLC served on 11/1/2019, answer due 11/22/2019. Service was accepted by Martin Reed, Senior Vice President. Document filed by Petroleos De Venezuela S.A.; PDVSA Petroleo S.A.. (Worthington, James)
November 1, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey B. Korn on behalf of PDV Holding, Inc.. (Korn, Jeffrey)
November 1, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tariq Mundiya on behalf of PDV Holding, Inc.. (Mundiya, Tariq)
November 1, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to GLAS Americas LLC. (pne)
October 30, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to GLAS Americas LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by PDV Holding, Inc., PDVSA Petroleo S.A., Petroleos De Venezuela S.A.. (Worthington, James)
October 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Robert Bliss on behalf of PDVSA Petroleo S.A., Petroleos De Venezuela S.A.. (Bliss, James)
October 30, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James B Worthington on behalf of PDVSA Petroleo S.A., Petroleos De Venezuela S.A.. (Worthington, James)
October 30, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to MUFG Union Bank, N.A.. (pne)
October 30, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to GLAS Americas LLC. (pne)
October 30, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
October 30, 2019 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
October 30, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by PDV Holding, Inc., PDVSA Petroleo S.A., Petroleos De Venezuela S.A..(Hansson, Kurt)
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Hansson, Kurt)
October 29, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to GLAS Americas LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by PDV Holding, Inc., PDVSA Petroleo S.A., Petroleos De Venezuela S.A.. (Hansson, Kurt)
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MUFG Union Bank, N.A., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by PDV Holding, Inc., PDVSA Petroleo S.A., Petroleos De Venezuela S.A.. (Hansson, Kurt)
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GLAS Americas LLC, MUFG Union Bank, N.A.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17855670)Document filed by Petroleos De Venezuela S.A., PDV Holding, Inc., PDVSA Petroleo S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Constitution of the Bolivarian Republic of Venezuela, Art. 303, #2 Exhibit B - National Assembly Resolution dated Feb. 13, 2019, #3 Exhibit C - National Assembly Resolution dated Sept. 27, 2016, #4 Exhibit D - National Assembly Resolution dated Oct. 15, 2019)(Hansson, Kurt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Petroleos De Venezuela S.A. et al v. MUFG Union Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PDVSA Petroleo S.A.
Represented By: Kurt Wayne Hansson
Represented By: James B Worthington
Represented By: James Robert Bliss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Petroleos De Venezuela S.A.
Represented By: Kurt Wayne Hansson
Represented By: James B Worthington
Represented By: James Robert Bliss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PDV Holding, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Julian Gottlieb
Represented By: Tariq Mundiya
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Korn
Represented By: Nathan Philip Eimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUFG Union Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Luke Sobota
Represented By: Walter Rieman
Represented By: Matthew S Salerno
Represented By: Jonathan Hillel Hurwitz
Represented By: Shane Donnelly Avidan
Represented By: Christopher J. Clark
Represented By: Zachary Kaye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLAS Americas LLC
Represented By: Luke Sobota
Represented By: Walter Rieman
Represented By: Matthew S Salerno
Represented By: Jonathan Hillel Hurwitz
Represented By: Shane Donnelly Avidan
Represented By: Christopher J. Clark
Represented By: Zachary Kaye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?