Whole Hemp Company LLC et al v. Buhl
Plaintiff: Kashif Shan and Whole Hemp Company LLC
Defendant: Teri Buhl
Case Number: 1:2019cv10073
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Teri Buhl waiver sent on 11/26/2019, answer due 1/27/2020. Document filed by Whole Hemp Company LLC; Kashif Shan. (Jain, Reena)
November 25, 2019 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #11 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED. The document was a duplicate entry. (dnh)
November 25, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Teri Buhl. (sj)
November 22, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Teri Buhl, re: #8 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Kashif Shan, Whole Hemp Company LLC. (Jain, Reena)
November 22, 2019 Filing 8 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Teri Buhl with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Whole Hemp Company LLC, Kashif Shan. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Jain, Reena)
November 6, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Summons, Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, Judge Broderick's Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases, Magistrate Judge Parker's Individual Practices in Civil Cases, and SDNY Electronic Case Filing Rules and Instructions served on Teri Buhl on November 4, 2019. Service was accepted by David King (Doorman). Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Kashif Shan, Whole Hemp Company LLC. (Jain, Reena)
November 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ofer Reger on behalf of Kashif Shan, Whole Hemp Company LLC. (Reger, Ofer)
October 31, 2019 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Folium Equity Holding LLC for Whole Hemp Company LLC. Document filed by Whole Hemp Company LLC.(Jain, Reena)
October 31, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Teri Buhl. (pne)
October 31, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
October 31, 2019 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
October 31, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Jain, Reena)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Teri Buhl, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Kashif Shan, Whole Hemp Company LLC. (Jain, Reena)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Teri Buhl. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17862398)Document filed by Whole Hemp Company LLC, Kashif Shan.(Jain, Reena)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whole Hemp Company LLC et al v. Buhl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kashif Shan
Represented By: Reena Jain
Represented By: Ofer Reger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Whole Hemp Company LLC
Represented By: Reena Jain
Represented By: Ofer Reger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teri Buhl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?