Correa v. Donahue
Plaintiff: Alice L Correa
Defendant: Patricia Luise Donahue, Patricia Donahue Heffron and Patricia Luise Heffron
Case Number: 1:2019cv10099
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: P Kevin Castel
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332oc
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Filing 9 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from David M. Dore dated December 27, 2019 re: Letter for Initial Pretrial Conference scheduled for January 6, 2020. Document filed by Alice L Correa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affirmation of service of letter upon pro se defendant Donahue)(Dore, David)
December 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE PRO SE by Patricia Luise Donahue. (sc)
December 9, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Patricia Luise Donahue.(sc)
December 2, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Patricia Luise Donahue served on 11/21/2019, answer due 12/12/2019. Service was accepted by Patricia Luise Donahue. Document filed by Alice L Correa. (Dore, David)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/6/2020 at 11:45 AM in Courtroom 11D at the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 11/6/2019) (mro)
November 1, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Patricia Luise Donahue. (dnh)
October 31, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Patricia Luise Donahue a/k/a Patricia Donahue Heffron, a/k/a Patricia Luise Heffron, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Alice L Correa. (Dore, David)
October 31, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
October 31, 2019 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
October 31, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Dore, David)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Patricia Luise Donahue. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17865361)Document filed by Alice L Correa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deed-Orita Correa to Orita Correa and Patricia Donahue, #2 Exhibit Deed-Orita Correa and Patricia Donahue to Patrica Heffron and Alice Correa, #3 Exhibit Deed-Patricia Heffron and Alice Correa to John Valle and Stefanny Valle, #4 Exhibit Forged check endorsement of Alice Correa)(Dore, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Correa v. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Luise Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Donahue Heffron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Luise Heffron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice L Correa
Represented By: David Matthew Dore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?