Brady v. IGS Realty Co. L.P. et al
Plaintiff: James H. Brady
Defendant: Philippe Ifrah and IGS Realty Co. L.P.
Case Number: 1:2019cv10142
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Referring Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
2 Judge: Ona T Wang
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332ij
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Filing 22 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from James H. Brady, dated 12/7/19 re: Plaintiff informs the Court that he filed his opposition papers three weeks early and with a Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, because of the very serious nature of this case with the blatant violation of the plaintiff's Constitutional Rights to due process, and because the Motion to Dismiss filed by Mr. Sheindlin on 11/27/19 proves conclusively that there is no dispute that Mr. Ifrah, IGS Realty and Mr. Sheindlin were able to force the sale of the Brady's commercial co-op etc. Document filed by James H. Brady.(sc)
December 17, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION & CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Document filed by James H. Brady.(sc)
December 17, 2019 Filing 20 PLAINTIFF'S AFFIDAVIT of James Brady IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS, AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, re: #5 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by James H. Brady. (sc)
December 16, 2019 Mailed a copy of #18 Memo Endorsement, to James H. Brady 510 Sicomac Ave. Wyckoff, NJ 07481. (aea)
December 9, 2019 Mailed a copy of #19 Order on Motion to Dismiss, to James H. Brady 510 Sicomac Ave. Wyckoff, NJ 07481. (vba)
December 6, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 1/6/2020 Replies due by 1/13/2020. (kv)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER with respect to #5 Motion to Dismiss. On November 27, 2019, Defendants IGS Realty Co., LP and Philippe Ifrah ("Defendants") filed a motion to dismiss the complaint. (ECF 5). By Judge Engelmayer's order, Plaintiff's request for a default was denied as moot, and Plaintiff, proceeding pro se, was directed to respond to the motion to dismiss. (ECF 18). Accordingly, Plaintiff shall file his opposition to Defendants' motion to dismiss by January 6, 2020. Defendants' reply, if any, is due January 13, 2020. The Clerk is respectfully requested to mail a copy of this Order to the pro se Plaintiff. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 12/6/2019) (kv) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
December 5, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PROPOSED ORDER. Notice to attorney Gregory Sheindlin to RE-FILE Document No. #17 Proposed Order. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The document needs to be titled as a proposed order. Please correct and re-file document. Re-file the document using the event type Proposed Order found under the event list Proposed Orders. (km)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #15 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default filed by James H. Brady. ENDORSEMENT: The Court denies any motion for default as moot. Defendants have already appeared and filed a motion to dismiss. Plaintiff should file a timely response to defendants' motion. This case remains referred to the Hon. Ona T. Wang, Magistrate Judge, for general pretrial purposes and for a report and recommendation on defendants' pending dispositive motion. All requests for relief should be addressed to Judge Wang. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail this Order to plaintiff. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 12/5/2019) (jwh) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
December 5, 2019 Filing 17 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by IGS Realty Co. L.P., Philippe Ifrah. Related Document Number: [5, 16]. (Sheindlin, Gregory) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 12/5/2019 (km).
December 5, 2019 Filing 16 AMENDED MOTION for Extension of Time to file motion to dismiss and/or answer., MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ., MOTION for Sanctions ., MOTION for Permanent Injunction against Brady to file actions without first receiving leave of Court. Document filed by IGS Realty Co. L.P., Philippe Ifrah. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Gregory Sheindlin, Esq., #2 Certificate of Service)(Sheindlin, Gregory)
December 4, 2019 Filing 15 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT, re: Philippe Ifrah. Document filed by James H. Brady. (sc) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).
December 4, 2019 Filing 14 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT, re: IGS Realty Co.L.P.. Document filed by James H. Brady. (sc) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).
December 3, 2019 Filing 13 LETTER from James H. Brady, dated 11/15/19 re: Plaintiff informs the Court that today he is filing a complaint titled James H. Brady v. Mark Friedlander; and it is imperative that the exhibits attached to this document are submitted individually, so that the judge assigned to the case can find the exhibits without huge inconvenience. Document filed by James H. Brady.(sc)
December 3, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint, served. Philippe Ifrah served on 11/1/2019, answer due 11/22/2019. Service was accepted by Natia DiVincinti. (sc) (Main Document 12 replaced on 12/4/2019) (sc).
December 3, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint, served. IGS Realty Co. L.P. served on 11/1/2019, answer due 11/22/2019. Service was accepted by Natia DiVincinti. Document filed by James H. Brady. (sc)
December 2, 2019 Filing 10 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from James H. Brady, dated 12/1/19 re: Plaintiff writes that, in a letter dated 11/28/19 to this Court, it was proven that the defendants in this complaint defaulted by not answering or otherwise replying to the complaint by 11/22/19; and that Docket #5 proves that the defaulting defendants did not file a Motion to Dismiss until 11/27/19 etc. Document filed by James H. Brady.(sc)
December 2, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER from James Brady, dated 11/28/19 re: Plaintiff informs the Court that both IGS Realty and Phillipe Ifrah were properly served with the Summons and Complaint on 11/1/19; and that no excuse is given by Mr. Sheindlin for the defaults of his clients Philippe Efrah or IGS Realty etc.. Document filed by James H. Brady.(sc)
December 2, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from James H. Brady, dated 11/28/19 re: Plaintiff needs to confirm that the Court will address the Request for Entry of Default before considering whether or not the Court will consider the Motion to Dismiss as moot, based on the unexcused default judgments etc. Document filed by James H. Brady.(sc)
December 2, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #5 MOTION to Dismiss. Motions referred to Ona T. Wang. (jwh)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AMENDED ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation): Motion for Dismissal, for Filing Injunction, and for Sanctions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. Motions referred to Ona T. Wang. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 12/2/2019) (jwh)
November 27, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PROPOSED ORDER. Notice to attorney Gregory Sheindlin to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Proposed Order. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The document needs to be titled as an Order. Please correct and re-file document. Re-file the document using the event type Proposed Order found under the event list Proposed Orders. (km)
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by IGS Realty Co. L.P., Philippe Ifrah. Related Document Number: #5 . (Sheindlin, Gregory) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 11/27/2019 (km).
November 27, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by IGS Realty Co. L.P., Philippe Ifrah. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit Complaint pages 1-31, #3 Exhibit Complaint pages 32-65, #4 Exhibit Affidavit of Ifrah, #5 Exhibit IGS Realty II, (08/27/2014) (ECF No. 117), #6 Exhibit Trial transcript, #7 Exhibit IGS Action I (ECF No. 333), Judgement, #8 Exhibit Brady v. Ostrager, 19-CV-7122, #9 Memorandum of Law, #10 Certificate of Service)(Sheindlin, Gregory)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 11/15/2019) (jwh)
November 14, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald is no longer assigned to the case. (bcu)
November 14, 2019 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (bcu)
November 14, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Judge Nelson Stephen Roman is no longer assigned to the case. (bcu)
October 31, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to IGS Realty Co. L.P., Philippe Ifrah. (sac)
October 31, 2019 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sac)
October 31, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sac)
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brady v. IGS Realty Co. L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philippe Ifrah
Represented By: Gregory Evrett Sheindlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IGS Realty Co. L.P.
Represented By: Gregory Evrett Sheindlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James H. Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?