Dominguez v. Banana Republic, LLC
Plaintiff: Yovanny Dominguez
Defendant: Banana Republic, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv10171
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Banana Republic, LLC answer due 1/27/2020. (rro)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. Application granted. The deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to January 27, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 12/11/2019) (rro)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Anne Marie Estevez to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (Daniels, Anthony)
December 9, 2019 Filing 10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to the Complaint addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Michael F. Fleming dated December 9, 2019. Document filed by Banana Republic, LLC.(Fleming, Michael)
December 9, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #8 MOTION for Anne Marie Estevez to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18245998. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
December 9, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Banana Republic, LLC served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019. Service was accepted by NANCY DOUGHERTY, LEGAL CLERK. Document filed by Yovanny Dominguez. (Marks, Bradly)
December 9, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Anne Marie Estevez to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18245998. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Banana Republic, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Anne Marie Estevez, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Estevez, Anne)
November 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Friel Fleming on behalf of Banana Republic, LLC. (Fleming, Michael)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that this case is referred for mediation to the Court-annexed Mediation Program. The parties are hereby notified that Local Rule 83.9 shall govern the mediation and are directed to participate in the mediation in good faith. The mediation should take place at least two weeks prior to the Initial Pretrial Conference, which is currently scheduled for February 25, 2020 at 4:00 p.m. by separate order to be entered today. The mediation will have no effect upon any scheduling order issued by this Court without leave of this Court. Mediators will be assigned based on the nature of suit. Additional expertise requests should promptly be directed to the Mediation Office. SO ORDERED. Please reference the following when corresponding with the Mediation Office. E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone (212) 805-0643, and facsimile (212) 805-0647. Mediator to be Assigned by 11/14/2019. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 11/4/2019) (mro)
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/25/2020 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 12C of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Daniel Patrick Moynihan U.S. Courthouse at 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 11/4/2019) (mro)
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Banana Republic, LLC. (pc)
November 4, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
November 4, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
November 4, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
November 1, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Banana Republic, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Yovanny Dominguez. (Marks, Bradly)
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Marks, Bradly)
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Banana Republic, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17878234)Document filed by Yovanny Dominguez.(Marks, Bradly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dominguez v. Banana Republic, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banana Republic, LLC
Represented By: Michael Friel Fleming
Represented By: Anne Marie Estevez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yovanny Dominguez
Represented By: Bradly Gurion Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?