Goddard v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Amtrak)
Plaintiff: Edward Goddard
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Coporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv10182
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material...SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 12/30/19) (yv)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material...SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman on 12/27/19) (yv)
December 24, 2019 Filing 14 PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Document filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Amtrak). (Joseph, Ronald)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED, as stated at the conference, that: 1. To the extent not already made, the parties shall make initial disclosures under Rule 26(a)(l) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure no later than January 8, 2020. 2. The parties shall serve their initial document requests and interrogatories no later than January 22, 2020. In their initial interrogatories, the parties may, as reasonable, seek information outside the scope of Local Civil Rule 33.3(a). 3. Any motions to amend the pleadings or to join any additional parties shall be filed no later than March 13, 2020. 4. All fact discovery shall be completed no later than April 20, 2020. 5. Expert discovery shall be conducted on the following schedule: a. Each party bearing the affirmative burden of proof on a claim or defense shall serve its expert report(s) with respect to that claim or defense no later than May 20, 2020. b. Rebuttal reports shall be served no later than June 19, 2020. c. Expert discovery shall be completed no later than July 17, 2020. 6. The parties may stipulate to modify interim deadlines in this Scheduling Order, without seeking prior leave of Court. 7. The parties shall submit a joint status letter to the Court, regarding discovery and the progress of settlement discussions, no later than March 13, 2020. SO ORDERED. Motions due by 3/13/2020. Fact Discovery due by 4/20/2020. Expert Discovery due by 7/17/2020. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman on 12/18/2019) (kv)
December 18, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 12/18/2019, ( Status Report due by 3/13/2020). (aba)
December 17, 2019 Minute Entry. Initial Conference set for 12/18/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman. (aba)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 12/17/2019) (jca)
December 13, 2019 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
December 13, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
December 13, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:19-cv-04249-PGG-DCF. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
December 9, 2019 Filing 11 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 19-04249. Document filed by Edward Goddard.(Myers, William)
December 9, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney William Louis Myers, Jr., for non compliance with Local Rule 13 of the Division of Business Among Judges. Attorney must electronically file the Related Case Statement. Use the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents. (wb)
December 6, 2019 Filing 10 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Ronald E. Joseph dated December 6, 2019 re: Response to Plaintiff's Request to Consolidate the Cases of Goddard and Zimmerman. Document filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Amtrak).(Joseph, Ronald)
December 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jamar Quartrell Green on behalf of National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Amtrak). (Green, Jamar)
December 6, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from William L. Myers Jr, Esquire dated December 6, 2019 re: Request to Consolidate the Cases of Goddard and Zimmerman for Purposes of Discovery. Document filed by Edward Goddard.(Myers, William)
December 2, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Amtrak).(Joseph, Ronald)
December 2, 2019 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate American Financial Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Passenger Railroad Insurance Limited, Other Affiliate Washington Terminal Company, Other Affiliate Canadian Pacific Railway, Other Affiliate Burlington Northern and Santa Fe LLC, Other Affiliate American Premier Underwriters, Inc., Other Affiliate Canadian National Railway, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway for National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Amtrak). Document filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Amtrak).(Joseph, Ronald)
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Amtrak) served on 11/14/2019, answer due 12/5/2019. Service was accepted by Brooklyn Brown. Document filed by Edward Goddard. (Myers, William)
November 4, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney William Louis Myers, Jr. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Amtrak). The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (pne)
November 4, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney William Louis Myers, Jr. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jury Demand code n (None); County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jury Demand code has been modified to p (Plaintiff); the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (pne)
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Amtrak). (pne)
November 4, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Paul G. Gardephe as possibly related to 19CV4249. (pne)
November 4, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
November 4, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pne)
November 4, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney William Louis Myers, Jr., for non compliance with Local Rule 13 of the Division of Business Among Judges. Attorney must electronically file the Related Case Statement. Use the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents. (pne)
November 1, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to National Railroad Passenger Corporation, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Edward Goddard. (Myers, William)
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Myers, William)
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against National Railroad Passenger Coporation. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17879738)Document filed by Edward Goddard.(Myers, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goddard v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Amtrak)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Coporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Goddard
Represented By: William Louis Myers, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?