MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC et al v. Allergan PLC et al
Plaintiff: MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC and MSPA Claims I, LLC
Defendant: Merz GmbH & Co. KGaA., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd., Barr Pharmaceuticals, LLC, ALLERGAN PLC f/k/a ACTAVIS PLS, Teva Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Forest Laboratories LLC, Merz Pharmaceuticals GmbH, Wockhardt Limited, Upsher-Smith Laboratories, Inc., Cobalt Laboratories, Inc., Wockhardt USA LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Cobalt Laboratories, LLC, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Merz Pharma GmbH & Co. KGaA and Allergan PLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv10184
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Anna Higgins to RE-FILE Document #51 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents/Other affiliates were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). (ldi)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (323 in 1:15-cv-06549-CM-RWL, 53 in 1:19-cv-10184-CM) Letter, filed by MSPA Claims I, LLC, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC. ENDORSEMENT: You are correct. One consolidated action, one revised order. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/17/2019) (mml)
December 18, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lloyd Edward Constantine on behalf of Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-06549-CM-RWL, 1:19-cv-10184-CM(Constantine, Lloyd)
December 17, 2019 Filing 56 DECLARATION of Matthew L. Cantor in Support re: (327 in 1:15-cv-06549-CM-RWL, 55 in 1:19-cv-10184-CM) MOTION for Matthew L. Cantor to Withdraw as Attorney .. Document filed by Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-06549-CM-RWL, 1:19-cv-10184-CM(Cantor, Matthew)
December 17, 2019 Filing 55 MOTION for Matthew L. Cantor to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-06549-CM-RWL, 1:19-cv-10184-CM(Cantor, Matthew)
December 17, 2019 Filing 54 MOTION to Amend/Correct (143 in 1:15-cv-06549-CM-RWL) Protective Order . Document filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims I, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-06549-CM-RWL, 1:19-cv-10184-CM(Higgins, Anna)
December 17, 2019 Filing 53 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Christopher L. Coffin dated December 17, 2019 re: Civil Case Management Plan. Document filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims I, LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-06549-CM-RWL, 1:19-cv-10184-CM(Coffin, Christopher)
December 13, 2019 Filing 52 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint,,,,, against Allergan PLC, Barr Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Cobalt Laboratories, LLC, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Forest Laboratories LLC, Merz GmbH & Co. KGaA., Merz Pharma GmbH & Co. KGaA, Merz Pharmaceuticals GmbH, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by MSPA Claims I, LLC, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint,,,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A SummaCare Assignment, #2 Exhibit B IMC Assignment, #3 Exhibit C 1-1, #4 Exhibit C 1-2, #5 Exhibit C 2-1, #6 Exhibit C 2-2, #7 Exhibit C 3-1, #8 Exhibit C 3-2, #9 Exhibit C 4-1, #10 Exhibit C 4-2, #11 Exhibit C 5-1, #12 Exhibit C 5-2, #13 Exhibit C 6-1, #14 Exhibit C 6-2, #15 Exhibit C 7-1, #16 Exhibit C 7-2, #17 Exhibit C 8-1, #18 Exhibit C 8-2, #19 Exhibit C 9-1, #20 Exhibit C 9-2, #21 Exhibit C 10-1, #22 Exhibit C 10-2, #23 Exhibit C 11-1, #24 Exhibit C 11-2, #25 Exhibit C 12-1, #26 Exhibit C 12-2, #27 Exhibit C 13-1, #28 Exhibit C 13-2, #29 Exhibit C 14-1, #30 Exhibit C 14-2, #31 Exhibit C 15-1, #32 Exhibit C 15-2, #33 Exhibit C 16-1, #34 Exhibit C 16-2, #35 Exhibit C 17-1, #36 Exhibit C 17-2, #37 Exhibit C 18)(Higgins, Anna)
December 11, 2019 Filing 51 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent MSP Recovery Services, LLC for MSPA Claims I, LLC. Document filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims I, LLC, Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-06549-CM-RWL, 1:19-cv-10184-CM(Higgins, Anna) Modified on 12/30/2019 (ldi).
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 REVISED MASTER ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. The stipulated scheduling order that was entered in the SBF Action on August 1, 2019 (Dkt. Nos. 275,276) is hereby vacated and is of no force and effect. 2. The MSP Plaintiffs may file an Amended Complaint consistent the additional discovery allegations contained in their December 9 letter by no later than December 13, 2019. 3. The two actions are hereby consolidated under case number 15 Civ. 6549, bearing the caption:IN RE NAMENDA INDIRECT PURCHASER ANTITRUST LITIGATION 4. The parties shall stamp all subsequent filings with the legend: [All actions/ SBF Action I MSP Action] 5. The trial date in the consolidated action is January 6, 2021. 6. The magistrate in the consolidated action is the Honorable Robert W. Lehrburger. 8. The deadline for all discovery in the consolidated action is April 30, 2020. This includes expert discovery. The parties are free to set their own deadlines within that period, but the April 30 date will NOT be extended. Please understand that you are now on a "rocket docket" expedited, multi-track discovery schedule. Any new discovery requests must be made by January 17, 2020, and any objections to those requests must be filed by January 24, 2020, so that Magistrate Judge Lehrburger can rule on them while there remains time for the discovery to be completed. Expert depositions will have to be taken in March and April, so expert reports must be served by March 1, 2020. Within that time frame, set your own schedule for what must be done - which should be limited, in light of the discovery taken in the Namenda Direct Purchaser Case. Motions for summary judgment must be filed by May 15, 2020. Opposition to those motions is due on May 29, 2020. Reply papers are due June 5, 2020. These dates will not be extended FOR ANY REASON. In limine motions must be made by October 2, 2020. Responses to in limine motions are due October 16, 2020. The court does not accept replies on in limine motions; if you file a reply it will not be read. Separate in limine motions must be made for each request for relief. You are limited to a six page double spaced 12 point type brief with no footnotes whatever. The Court will set a final pre-trial conference date later in the year. At that conference, the court will rule on any and all objections to exhibits, as well as set the final witness list. The Court will provide the parties with time limits for the presentation of their cases before October 2, 2020; they will not exceed seven trial days per side and may be shorter. The Court will hold an interim conference in this case on June 19, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. I emphasize that the trial date and all interim deadlines in this order are for real. They will not be extended for any reason. IT IS SO ORDERED. Amended Pleadings due by 12/13/2019. Motions due by 10/2/2020. Responses due by 10/16/2020 Replies due by 6/5/2020. Expert Discovery due by 4/30/2020. Discovery due by 4/30/2020. Status Conference set for 6/19/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Colleen McMahon. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/10/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-06549-CM-RWL, 1:19-cv-10184-CM BY ECF TO ALL PARTIES. (kv)
December 10, 2019 CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:15-cv-06549-CM-RWL.. (kv)
December 10, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Anna Higgins to RE-FILE Document #20 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents/Other affiliates were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). (ldi)
December 9, 2019 Filing 49 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Anna K. Higgins dated 12/9/2019 re: Diversity Jurisdiction. Document filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims I, LLC.(Higgins, Anna)
December 9, 2019 Filing 48 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Anna K. Higgins dated 12/9/2019 re: Court's Master Order ECF No. 47. Document filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims I, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Higgins, Anna)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MASTER ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. The stipulated scheduling order that was entered in the SBF Action on August 1, 2019 (Dkt. Nos. 275, 276) is hereby vacated and is of no force and effect. 2. The trial date in the SBF Action is January 6, 2021. 3. The deadline for all discovery in the SBF Action is April 30, 2020. This includes expert discovery. The parties are free to set their own deadlines within that period, but the April 30 date will NOT be extended. Please understand that you are now on a "rocket docket" expedited, multi-track discovery schedule. Any new discovery requests must be made by January 17, 2020, and any objections to those requests must be filed by January 24, 2020, so that Magistrate Judge Lehrburger can rule on them while there remains time for the discovery to be completed. Expert depositions will have to be taken in March and April, so expert reports must be served by March 1, 2020. Within that time frame, set your own schedule for what must be done - which should be limited, in light of the discovery taken in the Namenda Direct Purchaser Case. 4. Motions for summary judgment must be filed by May 15, 2020. Opposition to those motions is due on May 29, 2020. Reply papers are due June 5, 2020. These dates will not be extended FOR ANY REASON. 6. The Joint Pre-Trial Order, conforming to this Court's rules, will be due 30 calendar days after the issuance of decisions on motions for summary judgment. 7. In limine motions must be made by October 2, 2020. Responses to in limine motions are due October 16, 2020. The court does not accept replies on in limine motions; if you file a reply it will not be read. Separate in limine motions must be made for each request for relief. You are limited to a six page double spaced 12 point type brief with no footnotes whatever. 9. The Court will hold an interim conference in this case on June 19, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. 10. I emphasize that the trial date and all interim deadlines in this order are for real. They will not be extended for any reason, as further set forth in this Order. IT IS SO ORDERED. Motions due by 10/2/2020. Responses due by 10/16/2020 Expert Discovery due by 4/30/2020. Discovery due by 4/30/2020. Status Conference set for 6/19/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Colleen McMahon. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/9/2019) (mml)
December 5, 2019 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #46 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Colleen McMahon for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (km)
December 5, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Upsher-Smith Laboratories, Inc., Wockhardt Limited, Wockhardt USA LLC. Document filed by MSPA Claims I, LLC, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).. (Higgins, Anna)
December 5, 2019 Filing 45 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. waiver sent on 11/6/2019, answer due 2/4/2020. Document filed by MSPA Claims I, LLC; MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC. (Higgins, Anna)
December 5, 2019 Filing 44 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. waiver sent on 11/6/2019, answer due 2/4/2020. Document filed by MSPA Claims I, LLC; MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC. (Higgins, Anna)
December 5, 2019 Filing 43 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Cobalt Laboratories, LLC waiver sent on 11/14/2019, answer due 2/4/2020. Document filed by MSPA Claims I, LLC; MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC. (Higgins, Anna)
December 5, 2019 Filing 42 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Barr Pharmaceuticals, LLC waiver sent on 11/6/2019, answer due 2/4/2020. Document filed by MSPA Claims I, LLC; MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC. (Higgins, Anna)
December 4, 2019 Filing 41 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Upsher-Smith Laboratories, Inc. waiver sent on 11/6/2019, answer due 2/4/2020. Document filed by MSPA Claims I, LLC; MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC. (Higgins, Anna)
December 4, 2019 Filing 40 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd waiver sent on 11/6/2019, answer due 2/4/2020. Document filed by MSPA Claims I, LLC; MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC. (Higgins, Anna)
December 4, 2019 Filing 39 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC waiver sent on 11/6/2019, answer due 2/4/2020. Document filed by MSPA Claims I, LLC; MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC. (Higgins, Anna)
December 3, 2019 Filing 38 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc. waiver sent on 11/6/2019, answer due 2/4/2020. Document filed by MSPA Claims I, LLC; MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC. (Higgins, Anna)
December 3, 2019 Filing 37 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd. waiver sent on 11/6/2019, answer due 2/4/2020. Document filed by MSPA Claims I, LLC; MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC. (Higgins, Anna)
December 2, 2019 Filing 36 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Wockhardt USA LLC waiver sent on 11/6/2019, answer due 2/4/2020. Document filed by MSPA Claims I, LLC; MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC. (Higgins, Anna)
December 2, 2019 Filing 35 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Wockhardt Limited waiver sent on 11/6/2019, answer due 2/4/2020. Document filed by MSPA Claims I, LLC; MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC. (Higgins, Anna)
December 2, 2019 Filing 34 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Merz Pharmaceuticals GmbH waiver sent on 11/6/2019, answer due 2/4/2020. Document filed by MSPA Claims I, LLC; MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC. (Higgins, Anna)
December 2, 2019 Filing 33 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Merz Pharma GmbH & Co. KGaA waiver sent on 11/6/2019, answer due 2/4/2020. Document filed by MSPA Claims I, LLC; MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC. (Higgins, Anna)
December 2, 2019 Filing 32 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Merz GmbH & Co. KGaA. waiver sent on 11/6/2019, answer due 2/4/2020. Document filed by MSPA Claims I, LLC; MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC. (Higgins, Anna)
December 2, 2019 Filing 31 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Forest Laboratories LLC waiver sent on 11/6/2019, answer due 2/4/2020. Document filed by MSPA Claims I, LLC; MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC. (Higgins, Anna)
December 2, 2019 Filing 30 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Allergan PLC waiver sent on 11/6/2019, answer due 2/4/2020. Document filed by MSPA Claims I, LLC; MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC. (Higgins, Anna)
November 27, 2019 Filing 29 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Merz GmbH & Co. KGaA for Merz Pharma GmbH & Co. KGaA ; Corporate Parent Merz Holding GmbH & Co. KGaA for Merz GmbH & Co. KGaA.; Corporate Parent Merz Pharma GmbH & Co. KGaA for Merz Pharmaceuticals GmbH. Document filed by Merz GmbH & Co. KGaA., Merz Pharma GmbH & Co. KGaA, Merz Pharmaceuticals GmbH.(McDevitt, Heather)
November 27, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin Charles Adam on behalf of Merz GmbH & Co. KGaA., Merz Pharma GmbH & Co. KGaA, Merz Pharmaceuticals GmbH. (Adam, Kevin)
November 27, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Harold Bave, III on behalf of Merz GmbH & Co. KGaA., Merz Pharma GmbH & Co. KGaA, Merz Pharmaceuticals GmbH. (Bave, William)
November 27, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kristen O'Shaughnessy on behalf of Merz GmbH & Co. KGaA., Merz Pharma GmbH & Co. KGaA, Merz Pharmaceuticals GmbH. (O'Shaughnessy, Kristen)
November 27, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Hail Chung on behalf of Merz GmbH & Co. KGaA., Merz Pharma GmbH & Co. KGaA, Merz Pharmaceuticals GmbH. (Chung, John)
November 27, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Martin Michael Toto on behalf of Merz GmbH & Co. KGaA., Merz Pharma GmbH & Co. KGaA, Merz Pharmaceuticals GmbH. (Toto, Martin)
November 27, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Heather McDevitt on behalf of Merz GmbH & Co. KGaA., Merz Pharma GmbH & Co. KGaA, Merz Pharmaceuticals GmbH. (McDevitt, Heather)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #11 Motion for Christopher L. Coffin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HERBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/27/2019) (mml)
November 27, 2019 Filing 21 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC.(Higgins, Anna)
November 27, 2019 Filing 20 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT.. Document filed by MSPA Claims I, LLC.(Higgins, Anna) Modified on 12/10/2019 (ldi).
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. OK - means nothing about the swiftness with which the case will progress. Allergan PLC answer due 2/4/2020; Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC answer due 2/4/2020; Barr Pharmaceuticals, LLC answer due 2/4/2020; Cobalt Laboratories, LLC answer due 2/4/2020; Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd. answer due 2/4/2020; Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc. answer due 2/4/2020; Forest Laboratories LLC answer due 2/4/2020; MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC answer due 2/4/2020; MSPA Claims I, LLC answer due 2/4/2020; Merz GmbH & Co. KGaA. answer due 2/4/2020; Merz Pharma GmbH & Co. KGaA answer due 2/4/2020; Merz Pharmaceuticals GmbH answer due 2/4/2020; Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd answer due 2/4/2020; Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. answer due 2/4/2020; Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. answer due 2/4/2020; Upsher-Smith Laboratories, Inc. answer due 2/4/2020; Wockhardt Limited answer due 2/4/2020; Wockhardt USA LLC answer due 2/4/2020. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/26/2019) (jca)
November 26, 2019 Filing 18 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Allergan plc for Forest Laboratories LLC. Document filed by Allergan PLC, Forest Laboratories LLC.(Toto, Martin)
November 26, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin Charles Adam on behalf of Allergan PLC, Forest Laboratories LLC. (Adam, Kevin)
November 26, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Harold Bave, III on behalf of Allergan PLC, Forest Laboratories LLC. (Bave, William)
November 26, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kristen O'Shaughnessy on behalf of Allergan PLC, Forest Laboratories LLC. (O'Shaughnessy, Kristen)
November 26, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Hail Chung on behalf of Allergan PLC, Forest Laboratories LLC. (Chung, John)
November 26, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Heather McDevitt on behalf of Allergan PLC, Forest Laboratories LLC. (McDevitt, Heather)
November 26, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Martin Michael Toto on behalf of Allergan PLC, Forest Laboratories LLC. (Toto, Martin)
November 26, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #11 MOTION for Christopher L. Coffin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18154374. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
November 26, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Christopher L. Coffin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18154374. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims I, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Christopher L.Coffin, #2 Georgia Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Louisiana Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Proposed Order)(Coffin, Christopher)
November 26, 2019 Filing 10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint,,,,, addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Anna K. Higgins dated 11/26/2019. Document filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims I, LLC.(Higgins, Anna)
November 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric Peter Stephens on behalf of Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc.. (Stephens, Eric)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SCHEDULING AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/21/2020 at 11:45 AM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/22/2019) (cf)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #6 Motion for Tracy L. Turner to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HERBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/22/2019) (mml)
November 21, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #6 MOTION for Tracy L. Turner to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18118163. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
November 21, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Tracy L. Turner to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18118163. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims I, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Turner, Tracy)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #4 Motion for Anna K. Higgins to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/14/2019) (mml)
November 14, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #4 MOTION for Anna K. Higgins to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18062070. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Anna K. Higgins to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18062070. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims I, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Higgins, Anna)
November 8, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb)
November 8, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
November 8, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:15-cv-06549-CM-RWL. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 15cv6549. Document filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims I, LLC.(Placitella, Christopher)
November 6, 2019 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Allergan PLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Barr Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Cobalt Laboratories, LLC, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd., Forest Laboratories LLC, Merz GmbH & Co. KGaA., Merz Pharmaceuticals GmbH, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Upsher-Smith Laboratories, Inc., Wockhardt Limited, Wockhardt USA LLC, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Merz Pharma GmbH & Co. KGaA added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,,,,,.Document filed by MSPA Claims I, LLC, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint,,,,,.(Placitella, Christopher)
November 6, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Christopher M Placitella re: Document No. #1 Complaint,,,,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Inc., and Merz Pharma GmbH & Co. KGaA must be added to the case. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. **DO NOT USE GOOGLE CHROME OR SAFARI BROWSERS** (pne)
November 6, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Christopher M Placitella. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Allergan PLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Barr Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Cobalt Laboratories, LLC, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd., Forest Laboratories LLC, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims I, LLC, Merz GmbH & Co. KGaA., Merz Pharmaceuticals GmbH, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Upsher-Smith Laboratories, Inc., Wockhardt Limited, Wockhardt USA LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted. (pne)
November 6, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Christopher M Placitella. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code Civil Miscellaneous Case - Other; Citizenship Plaintiff code 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); Citizenship Defendant code 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1332; the Citizenship Plaintiff code has been modified to 2 (Citizen of Another State); the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 2 (Citizen of Another State); the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (pne)
November 6, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Colleen McMahon as possibly related to 15CV6549. (pne)
November 6, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
November 6, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pne)
November 6, 2019 Civil Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #1 Complaint,,,,,. Filing fee $ 400.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-17879944, paid on 11/1/2019. (pne)
November 6, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Christopher M Placitella, for non compliance with Local Rule 13 of the Division of Business Among Judges. Attorney must electronically file the Related Case Statement. Use the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents. (pne)
November 5, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Placitella, Christopher)
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALLERGAN PLC f/k/a ACTAVIS PLS, Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Barr Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Cobalt Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd., Forest Laboratories LLC, Merz GmbH & Co. KGaA., Merz Pharmaceuticals GmbH, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Upsher-Smith Laboratories, Inc., Wockhardt Limited, Wockhardt USA LLC. Document filed by MSPA Claims I, LLC, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C-1-1, #4 Exhibit C-1-2, #5 Exhibit C-2-1, #6 Exhibit C-2-2, #7 Exhibit C-3-1, #8 Exhibit C-3-2, #9 Exhibit C-4-1, #10 Exhibit C-4-2, #11 Exhibit C-5-1, #12 Exhibit C-6-1, #13 Exhibit C-6-2, #14 Exhibit C-7-1, #15 Exhibit C-7-2, #16 Exhibit C-8-1, #17 Exhibit C-8-2, #18 Exhibit C-9-1, #19 Exhibit C-9-2, #20 Exhibit C-10-1, #21 Exhibit C-10-2, #22 Exhibit C-11-1, #23 Exhibit C-11-2, #24 Exhibit C-12-1, #25 Exhibit C-12-2, #26 Exhibit C-13-1, #27 Exhibit C-13-2, #28 Exhibit C-14-1, #29 Exhibit C-14-2, #30 Exhibit C-15-1, #31 Exhibit C-15-2, #32 Exhibit C-16-1, #33 Exhibit C-16-2, #34 Exhibit C-17-1, #35 Exhibit C-17-2, #36 Exhibit C-18)(Placitella, Christopher)
November 4, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Christopher M Placitella to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 11/12/2019. (pne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC et al v. Allergan PLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merz GmbH & Co. KGaA.
Represented By: Kevin Charles Adam
Represented By: Heather McDevitt
Represented By: William Harold Bave, III
Represented By: Kristen O'Shaughnessy
Represented By: Martin Michael Toto
Represented By: John Hail Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd.
Represented By: Eric Peter Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barr Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLERGAN PLC f/k/a ACTAVIS PLS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest Laboratories LLC
Represented By: William Harold Bave, III
Represented By: Kristen O'Shaughnessy
Represented By: Heather McDevitt
Represented By: Martin Michael Toto
Represented By: John Hail Chung
Represented By: Kevin Charles Adam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merz Pharmaceuticals GmbH
Represented By: Kevin Charles Adam
Represented By: Heather McDevitt
Represented By: William Harold Bave, III
Represented By: Kristen O'Shaughnessy
Represented By: Martin Michael Toto
Represented By: John Hail Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wockhardt Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Upsher-Smith Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cobalt Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wockhardt USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cobalt Laboratories, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Peter Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merz Pharma GmbH & Co. KGaA
Represented By: Kevin Charles Adam
Represented By: Heather McDevitt
Represented By: William Harold Bave, III
Represented By: Kristen O'Shaughnessy
Represented By: Martin Michael Toto
Represented By: John Hail Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Represented By: William Harold Bave, III
Represented By: Kristen O'Shaughnessy
Represented By: Heather McDevitt
Represented By: Martin Michael Toto
Represented By: John Hail Chung
Represented By: Kevin Charles Adam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC
Represented By: Tracy Turner
Represented By: Christopher L. Coffin
Represented By: Anna Higgins
Represented By: Christopher M Placitella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSPA Claims I, LLC
Represented By: Tracy Turner
Represented By: Christopher L. Coffin
Represented By: Anna Higgins
Represented By: Christopher M Placitella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?