Van Soeren v. Disney Streaming Service
Plaintiff: Steven Van Soeren
Defendant: Disney Streaming Service
Case Number: 1:2019cv10196
Filed: November 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Naomi Reice Buchwald
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Disney Streaming Service answer due 1/10/2020. (ama)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: granting #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 12/09/2019) (ama)
December 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Miriam Jerry Manber on behalf of Disney Streaming Service. (Manber, Miriam)
December 9, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Helene Hechtkopf dated December 9, 2019. Document filed by Disney Streaming Service.(Hechtkopf, Helene)
December 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Helene Rachel Hechtkopf on behalf of Disney Streaming Service. (Hechtkopf, Helene)
November 27, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Disney Streaming Service served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019. Service was accepted by Lauren Marcinek. Document filed by Steven Van Soeren. (Aletor, Annette)
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Aletor, Annette)
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Disney Streaming Service. (dnh)
November 4, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Annette Aizenose Aletor. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (dnh)
November 4, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
November 4, 2019 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
November 4, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
November 4, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Annette Aizenose Aletor. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
November 4, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Annette Aizenose Aletor. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Steven Van Soeren, Disney Streaming Service. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party role was entered incorrectly; alias party type was entered incorrectly. (dnh)
November 2, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Disney Streaming Service, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by STEVEN VAN SOEREN. (Aletor, Annette)
November 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DISNEY STREAMING SERVICE. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17882074)Document filed by STEVEN VAN SOEREN.(Aletor, Annette)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Van Soeren v. Disney Streaming Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Disney Streaming Service
Represented By: Helene Rachel Hechtkopf
Represented By: Miriam Jerry Manber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Van Soeren
Represented By: Annette Aizenose Aletor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?