Academy Orthotic & Prosthetic Associates IPA, Inc. et al v. Fitango Health, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Academy Orthotic & Prosthetic Associates IPA, Inc. and Acadacare, LLC
Defendant: Christina Vorvis, Fitango Health, Inc. and Dov Biran
Case Number: 1:2019cv10203
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: J Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Filing 20 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 Amended Complaint,, addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Guy Yonay dated December 23, 2019. Document filed by Dov Biran, Fitango Health, Inc., Christina Vorvis.(Benowich, Sarah)
December 20, 2019 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dov Biran, Fitango Health, Inc., Christina Vorvis.Document filed by Academy Orthotic & Prosthetic Associates IPA, Inc., Acadacare, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4, #5 Exhibit Ex. 5, #6 Exhibit Ex. 6, #7 Exhibit Ex. 7, #8 Exhibit Ex. 8, #9 Exhibit Ex. 9, #10 Exhibit Ex. 10, #11 Exhibit Ex. 11, #12 Exhibit Ex. 12, #13 Exhibit Ex. 13, #14 Exhibit Ex. 14, #15 Exhibit Ex. 15, #16 Exhibit Ex. 16, #17 Exhibit Ex. 17)(Butt, Samuel)
December 6, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #17 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Dov Biran, Fitango Health, Inc., Christina Vorvis. (Yonay, Guy)
December 6, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Dov Biran, Fitango Health, Inc., Christina Vorvis.(Yonay, Guy)
December 4, 2019 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #5 -5 Notice of Removal per 12/3/2019 text only order. (mt)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #16 Motion to Seal Document. GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO REMOVE DOCKET NUMBER 5-5 FROM THE DOCKET. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (bh) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
November 26, 2019 Filing 16 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document #5 Notice of Removal,, addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Samuel L. Butt dated November 26, 3029. Document filed by Acadacare, LLC, Academy Orthotic & Prosthetic Associates IPA, Inc..(Butt, Samuel) Modified on 12/4/2019 (mt).
November 21, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 11/12/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
November 21, 2019 Filing 14 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 11/12/2019 before Judge J. Paul Oetken. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Andrew Walker, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/12/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/23/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/19/2020.(McGuirk, Kelly)
November 12, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. Paul Oetken: Scheduling Conference held on 11/12/2019. Plaintiffs' motion due by 11/15/2019 with defendants' response by 11/22/2019. The answer or motion to dismiss is due by 12/6/2019. (bh)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #4 Letter Motion for Conference. GRANTED. COUNSEL FOR ALL PARTIES ARE DIRECTED TO APPEAR FOR A CONFERENCE WITH THE COURT ON NOVEMBER 12, 2019, AT 10:30 A.M. THE CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD IN COURTROOM 706 OF THE THURGOOD MARSHALL UNITED STATES COURTHOUSE, 40 FOLEY SQUARE, NEW YORK, NEW YORK. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (bh)
November 8, 2019 Filing 12 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (jgo)
November 8, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Marquez Lundin on behalf of Acadacare, LLC, Academy Orthotic & Prosthetic Associates IPA, Inc.. (Lundin, John)
November 8, 2019 Filing 10 LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Jeffrey M. Eilender dated November 8, 2019 re: Defendants' letter dated November 7, 2019. Document filed by Acadacare, LLC, Academy Orthotic & Prosthetic Associates IPA, Inc..(Eilender, Jeffrey)
November 7, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Guy Yonay dated November 7, 2019 re: Plaintiff's Letter Motion. Document filed by Dov Biran, Fitango Health, Inc., Christina Vorvis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Yonay, Guy)
November 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sarah Elizabeth Benowich on behalf of Dov Biran, Fitango Health, Inc., Christina Vorvis. (Benowich, Sarah)
November 7, 2019 Filing 7 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Yonay, Guy)
November 7, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Yonay, Guy)
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 656460/2019..Document filed by Dov Biran, Fitango Health, Inc., Christina Vorvis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1 to Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 to Complaint, #4 Exhibit 3 to Complaint, # 5 Exhibit 4 to Complaint, #6 Exhibit 5 to Complaint, #7 Exhibit 6 to Complaint, #8 Exhibit 7 to Complaint, #9 Exhibit 8 to Complaint, #10 Exhibit 9 to Complaint, #11 Exhibit 10 to Complaint, #12 Exhibit Summons)(Yonay, Guy)
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Jeffrey M. Eilender dated November 5, 2019. Document filed by Acadacare, LLC, Academy Orthotic & Prosthetic Associates IPA, Inc..(Eilender, Jeffrey)
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Samuel Lucien Butt on behalf of Acadacare, LLC, Academy Orthotic & Prosthetic Associates IPA, Inc.. (Butt, Samuel)
November 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey M. Eilender on behalf of Acadacare, LLC, Academy Orthotic & Prosthetic Associates IPA, Inc.. (Eilender, Jeffrey)
November 5, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
November 5, 2019 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
November 5, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
November 5, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT. Notice to Attorney Guy Yonay to submit a completed AO 121 Form Copyright to court for review. Use the event type AO 121 Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
November 5, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Guy Yonay. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
November 5, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Guy Yonay to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): pursuant to Rule 13.3, exhibits must be labeled (i.e. Summons and Complaint). Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 646460/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17886159).Document filed by Dov Biran, Fitango Health, Inc., Christina Vorvis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Yonay, Guy) Modified on 11/5/2019 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Academy Orthotic & Prosthetic Associates IPA, Inc. et al v. Fitango Health, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Academy Orthotic & Prosthetic Associates IPA, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Eilender
Represented By: John Marquez Lundin
Represented By: Samuel Lucien Butt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Acadacare, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Eilender
Represented By: John Marquez Lundin
Represented By: Samuel Lucien Butt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina Vorvis
Represented By: Guy Yonay
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Benowich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fitango Health, Inc.
Represented By: Guy Yonay
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Benowich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dov Biran
Represented By: Guy Yonay
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Benowich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?