The One Technologies, LLC v. Amazon.Com, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: The One Technologies, LLC
Defendant: Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon.com Services, Inc. and Jeffrey P. Bezos
Case Number: 1:2019cv10240
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alvin K Hellerstein
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125la
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned counsel for Plaintiff and the undersigned counsel for Defendants, that each Defendant's deadline to file its/his responsive pleading or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended until on or before January 21, 2020. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Amazon.Com, Inc. answer due 1/21/2020; Amazon.com Services, Inc. answer due 1/21/2020; Jeffrey P. Bezos answer due 1/21/2020.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/16/19) (yv)
December 11, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, until on or before January 21, 2020. Document filed by The One Technologies, LLC.(Randolph, M)
December 3, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons in a Civil Action and Complaint for Damages and Equitable Relief with Exhibits 1-20 served on Amazon.com Services, Inc. on 11/18/2019. Service was accepted by Maureen Cogan, that deponent knew the person so served to be the authorized agent of the corporation. Document filed by The One Technologies, LLC. (Randolph, M)
December 3, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons in a Civil Action and Complaint for Damages and Equitable Relief with Exhibits 1-20 served on Jeffrey P. Bezos on 11/19/2019. Service was accepted by Shayla "Doe" (Refused to Give Last Name) [Co-Worker], a person of suitable age and discretion. Said premises is defendant's actual place of business within the state.. Document filed by The One Technologies, LLC. (Randolph, M)
December 3, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons in a Civil Action and Complaint for Damages and Equitable Relief with Exhibits 1-20 served on Amazon.com, Inc. on 11/19/2019. Service was accepted by Cynthia Jones (authorized to accept service). Document filed by The One Technologies, LLC. (Randolph, M)
December 3, 2019 Filing 9 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 15 U.S.C. 1116, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following trademark(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (pne)
November 13, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jeffrey P. Bezos. (dnh)
November 13, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Amazon.com Services, Inc.. (dnh)
November 13, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Amazon.Com, Inc.. (dnh)
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review.(Randolph, M)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jeffrey P. Bezos, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by The One Technologies, LLC. (Randolph, M)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Amazon.com Services, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by The One Technologies, LLC. (Randolph, M)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Amazon.com, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by The One Technologies, LLC. (Randolph, M)
November 5, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 120 FORM PATENT/TRADEMARK. Notice to Attorney M Bradford Randolph to submit a completed AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark to court for review. Use the event type AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (pne)
November 5, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney M Bradford Randolph. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pne)
November 5, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
November 5, 2019 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
November 5, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon.com Services, Inc., Jeffrey P. Bezos. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17891641)Document filed by The One Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 - 5, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 6 - 10, #3 Exhibit Exhibits 11 - 15, #4 Exhibit Exhibits 16 - 20)(Randolph, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The One Technologies, LLC v. Amazon.Com, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.Com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey P. Bezos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The One Technologies, LLC
Represented By: M Bradford Randolph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?