Del Rio et al v. McCabe, Weisberg & Conway, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Alfred Del Rio, Olivia Del Rio and Alfredo Del Rio
Defendant: McCabe, Weisberg & Conway, LLC, THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON FKA THE BANK OF NEW YORK, AS TRUSTEE FOR THE CERTIFICATEHOLDERS OF CWALT INC., ALTERNATIVE LOAN TRUST 2007-11T1, MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2007-11T1, NEWREZ LLC D/B/A SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING, Newrez LLC and The Bank of New York Mellon
Case Number: 1:2019cv10312
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Jeffrey B. McCarron to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vernon S. Broderick)(Text Only Order) (msa)
December 30, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #24 MOTION for Jeffrey B. McCarron to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18385377. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
December 30, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Jeffrey B. McCarron to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18385377. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by McCabe, Weisberg & Conway, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Dougherty, Candidus)
December 16, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: (Motions due by 1/8/2020., Responses due by 2/7/2020, Replies due by 2/21/2020.), (rro)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File; granting #22 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 12/16/2019) (rro)
December 13, 2019 Filing 22 SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File and first request to approve agreed briefing schedule for defendants motion to dismiss the complaint addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Jordan M. Smith dated December 13, 2019., LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Jordan M. Smith dated December 13, 2019. Document filed by Newrez LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon.(Smith, Jordan)
December 12, 2019 Filing 21 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by McCabe, Weisberg & Conway, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of service)(Dougherty, Candidus)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Candidus K. Dougherty to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vernon S. Broderick)(Text Only Order) (msa)
December 12, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #19 MOTION for Candidus K. Dougherty to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18263907. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
December 11, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Candidus K. Dougherty to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18263907. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by McCabe, Weisberg & Conway, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of service, #4 Certificate of good standing)(Dougherty, Candidus)
December 9, 2019 Filing 18 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Shellpoint Partners LLC, Corporate Parent NRM Acquisition LLC, Corporate Parent NRM Acquisition II LLC, Corporate Parent New Residential Mortgage LLC, Corporate Parent New Residential Investment Corporation for Newrez LLC; Corporate Parent The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation for The Bank of New York Mellon. Document filed by Newrez LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon.(Smith, Jordan)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (McCabe, Weisberg & Conway, LLC answer due 1/8/2020.) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 12/6/2019) (rro)
December 5, 2019 Filing 16 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Edmund K. John dated 12/5/2019. Document filed by McCabe, Weisberg & Conway, LLC.(John, Edmund)
December 5, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Edmund Kean John on behalf of McCabe, Weisberg & Conway, LLC. (John, Edmund)
November 26, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. The Bank of New York Mellon served on 11/12/2019, answer due 12/20/2019. Service was accepted by Cassandra Mathieu, Paralegal Authorized to Accept. Document filed by Alfred Del Rio; Olivia Del Rio. (Christou, Andreas)
November 26, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Newrez LLC served on 11/12/2019, answer due 12/20/2019. Service was accepted by Bonnie Yerry, Legal Representative and Authorized Agent. Document filed by Alfred Del Rio; Olivia Del Rio. (Christou, Andreas)
November 26, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. McCabe, Weisberg & Conway, LLC served on 11/18/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. Service was accepted by Jane Doe (Refused Full Name), Manager/Managing Agent. Document filed by Alfred Del Rio; Olivia Del Rio. (Christou, Andreas)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. APPLICATION GRANTED. Newrez LLC answer due 12/20/2019; The Bank of New York Mellon answer due 12/20/2019 (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 11/20/2019) (cf)
November 19, 2019 Filing 10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Dec. 20, 2019 addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Jordan M. Smith dated 11/19/2019. Document filed by Newrez LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon.(Smith, Jordan)
November 14, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alex Kadochnikov on behalf of Alfred Del Rio, Olivia Del Rio. (Kadochnikov, Alex)
November 7, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Bank of New York Mellon. (pc)
November 7, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to McCabe, Weisberg & Conway, LLC. (pc)
November 7, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Newrez LLC. (pc)
November 7, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
November 7, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
November 7, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
November 7, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Andreas Euripides Christou. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Alfred Del Rio, NEWREZ LLC D/B/A SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING, THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON FKA THE BANK OF NEW YORK, AS TRUSTEE FOR THE CERTIFICATEHOLDERS OF CWALT INC., ALTERNATIVE LOAN TRUST 2007-11T1, MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2007-11T1. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted; alias party name was omitted;. (pc)
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON FKA THE BANK OF NEW YORK, AS TRUSTEE FOR THE CERTIFICATEHOLDERS OF CWALT INC., ALTERNATIVE LOAN TRUST 2007-11T1, MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2007-11T1, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Alfred Del Rio, Olivia Del Rio. (Christou, Andreas)
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NEWREZ LLC D/B/A SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Alfred Del Rio, Olivia Del Rio. (Christou, Andreas)
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to McCABE, WEISBERG & CONWAY, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Alfred Del Rio, Olivia Del Rio. (Christou, Andreas)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Christou, Andreas)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against McCabe, Weisberg & Conway, LLC, NEWREZ LLC D/B/A SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING, THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON FKA THE BANK OF NEW YORK, AS TRUSTEE FOR THE CERTIFICATEHOLDERS OF CWALT INC., ALTERNATIVE LOAN TRUST 2007-11T1, MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2007-11T1. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17907156)Document filed by Alfred Del Rio, Olivia Del Rio.(Christou, Andreas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Del Rio et al v. McCabe, Weisberg & Conway, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred Del Rio
Represented By: Andreas Euripides Christou
Represented By: Alex Kadochnikov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olivia Del Rio
Represented By: Andreas Euripides Christou
Represented By: Alex Kadochnikov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfredo Del Rio
Represented By: Andreas Euripides Christou
Represented By: Alex Kadochnikov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCabe, Weisberg & Conway, LLC
Represented By: Candidus K Dougherty
Represented By: Edmund Kean John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON FKA THE BANK OF NEW YORK, AS TRUSTEE FOR THE CERTIFICATEHOLDERS OF CWALT INC., ALTERNATIVE LOAN TRUST 2007-11T1, MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2007-11T1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEWREZ LLC D/B/A SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newrez LLC
Represented By: Jordan Michael Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Jordan Michael Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?