Ramales v. CBS Interactive Inc.
Plaintiff: Ulices Ramales
Defendant: CBS Interactive Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv10350
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 Filing 14 INITIAL REPORT OF PARTIES BEFORE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Document filed by Ulices Ramales. (Attachments: #1 Joint Letter)(Liebowitz, Richard)
December 20, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by CBS Interactive Inc..(Penchina, Robert)
December 17, 2019 Filing 12 SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent ViacomCBS Inc., Other Affiliate National Amusements, Inc. for CBS Interactive Inc.. Document filed by CBS Interactive Inc..(Penchina, Robert)
December 2, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: CBS Interactive Inc. answer due 12/27/2019. (cf)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. GRANTED. By December 27, 2019, Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 12/2/2019) (cf) Modified on 12/2/2019 (cf).
December 2, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Robert Penchina dated December 2, 2019. Document filed by CBS Interactive Inc..(Penchina, Robert)
December 2, 2019 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent CBS Corporation, Other Affiliate National Amusements, Inc. for CBS Interactive Inc.. Document filed by CBS Interactive Inc..(Penchina, Robert)
December 2, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Penchina on behalf of CBS Interactive Inc.. (Penchina, Robert)
November 17, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. CBS Interactive Inc. served on 11/8/2019, answer due 11/29/2019. Document filed by Ulices Ramales. (Liebowitz, Richard)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 1/9/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Analisa Torres. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 11/8/2019) (va)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. (As further set forth in this Order. The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 11/8/2019) (cf)
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Liebowitz, Richard)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to CBS Interactive Inc.. (dnh)
November 7, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
November 7, 2019 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
November 7, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
November 7, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz to submit a completed AO 121 Form Copyright to court for review. Use the event type AO 121 Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
November 7, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CBS Interactive Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ulices Ramales. (Liebowitz, Richard)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CBS Interactive Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17911064)Document filed by Ulices Ramales. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramales v. CBS Interactive Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ulices Ramales
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Interactive Inc.
Represented By: Robert Penchina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?