NYC Image International, Inc. v. RS USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: NYC IMAGE INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Defendant: MD RUSTOM ALI, RS USA, INC and RS USA, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv10355
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 1/25/2020. Replies due by 2/8/2020. (va)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 1/3/2020) (va)
January 2, 2020 Filing 14 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to the Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants RS USA, Inc. and MD Rustom Ali addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Maryann Stallone dated January 2, 2020. Document filed by NYC Image International, Inc..(Stallone, Maryann)
December 21, 2019 Filing 13 DECLARATION of David S. Schwartz in Support re: #11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint.. Document filed by MD Rustom Ali, RS USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Registration)(Schwartz, David)
December 21, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. . Document filed by MD Rustom Ali, RS USA, Inc.. (Schwartz, David)
December 21, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Document filed by MD Rustom Ali, RS USA, Inc..(Schwartz, David)
November 12, 2019 Filing 10 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (jgo)
November 12, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to MD Rustom Ali. (dnh)
November 12, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to RS USA, Inc.. (dnh)
November 11, 2019 Filing 7 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Stallone, Maryann)
November 8, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT. Notice to Attorney Maryann Concettina Stallone to submit a completed AO 121 Form Copyright to court for review. Use the event type AO 121 Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
November 8, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MD Rustom Ali, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by NYC Image International, Inc.. (Stallone, Maryann)
November 8, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to RS USA, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by NYC Image International, Inc.. (Stallone, Maryann)
November 8, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Maryann Concettina Stallone to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons, #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): party name on the PDF case caption does not exactly match pleading caption; party name on 'as to' docket entry text does not exactly match pleading caption;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
November 8, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
November 8, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
November 8, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
November 8, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Maryann Concettina Stallone. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: NYC Image International, Inc.; RS USA, Inc.; MD Rustom Ali. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (jgo)
November 8, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Maryann Concettina Stallone. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Kings;. (jgo)
November 7, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Stallone, Maryann)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MD Ruston Ali, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by NYC IMAGE INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Stallone, Maryann) Modified on 11/8/2019 (jgo).
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to RS USA, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by NYC IMAGE INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Stallone, Maryann) Modified on 11/8/2019 (jgo).
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MD RUSTOM ALI, RS USA, INC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17914742)Document filed by NYC IMAGE INTERNATIONAL, INC..(Stallone, Maryann)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NYC Image International, Inc. v. RS USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD RUSTOM ALI
Represented By: David Samuel Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RS USA, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RS USA, Inc.
Represented By: David Samuel Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NYC IMAGE INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: Maryann Concettina Stallone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?