Abrams v. HBM Prenscia Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Scott B. Abrams
Defendant: Spectris Inc., HBM Prenscia Inc. and Spectris plc
Case Number: 1:2019cv10357
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332oc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sjo)
November 7, 2019 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
November 7, 2019 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sjo)
November 7, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
November 7, 2019 Filing 20 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of New York Eastern; Case Number: 2:19-cv-02355. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Case transferred to District of Southern District of New York. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE.. So Ordered by Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 10/31/2019. (Almonte, Giselle) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/7/2019.]
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TRANSFER ORDER: ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. That provision of Rule 83.1 of the Local Rules of the Southern and Eastern Districts of New York which requires a seven-day delay is waived. Upon transfer of the case, the Clerk of Court shall close this case. So Ordered by Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 10/31/2019. (Almonte, Giselle) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/7/2019.]
November 5, 2019 Filing 18 STIPULATION re Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by HBM Prenscia Inc., Spectris Inc., Spectris plc (McLaughlin, Matthew) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/7/2019.]
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER re #17 : The application is denied with leave to renew. Counsel is directed to file a new stipulation containing the signature of the client. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 10/31/2019. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/7/2019.]
October 29, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by HBM Prenscia Inc., Spectris Inc., Spectris plc. (McLaughlin, Matthew) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/7/2019.]
October 24, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa J. Friedman on behalf of HBM Prenscia Inc., Spectris Inc., Spectris plc (aty to be noticed) (Friedman, Melissa) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/7/2019.]
October 24, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan E. Schoenfeld on behalf of HBM Prenscia Inc., Spectris Inc., Spectris plc (aty to be noticed) (Schoenfeld, Alan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/7/2019.]
July 24, 2019 Filing 14 DECLARATION in Response to Court's Order to Show Cause by Scott B. Abrams (Marchese, Giovanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/7/2019.]
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff is directed to show cause in a writing filed on or before July 29, 2019, why this action should not be transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York (the "SDNY"). Plaintiff's complaint alleges that "[t]he Court has personal jurisdiction over Defendants because they 'knowingly and willingly consent[ed] to and agree[d] to submit to the exclusive jurisdiction of any federal or state court located in New York County, State of New York, to the exclusion of... any other courts.'" (Complaint, 8 (quoting Share Purchase Agreement 10.16) (alterations in Complaint.)) However, this Court is not located in New York County; the SDNY is. To the extent that defendants wish to reply to plaintiff's response to this Order to Show Cause, they shall file that reply on or before August 2, 2019. Ordered by Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 7/23/2019. (Caspari, Alexander) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/7/2019.]
July 22, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re #1 Complaint, Response Letter filed by Scott B. Abrams. (Brickell, Jamie) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/7/2019.]
July 15, 2019 Filing 12 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re #1 Complaint, by HBM Prenscia Inc., Spectris Inc., Spectris plc. (McLaughlin, Matthew) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/7/2019.]
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The stipulation is so ordered. The time to answer is extended to 7/15/19. Ordered by Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 5/22/2019. (Taronji, Robert) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/7/2019.]
May 22, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Elise Margaret Gabriel on behalf of HBM Prenscia Inc., Spectris Inc., Spectris plc (aty to be noticed) (Gabriel, Elise) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/7/2019.]
May 21, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf. Judge Joseph F. Bianco no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Russo, Eric) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/7/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 10 Letter to the Honorable Joseph F. Bianco regarding Defendants' time to respond by HBM Prenscia Inc., Spectris Inc., Spectris plc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (McLaughlin, Matthew) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/7/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HBM Prenscia Inc., Spectris Inc., Spectris plc identifying Corporate Parent Spectris Inc. for HBM Prenscia Inc.; Corporate Parent Spectris plc for Spectris Inc.. (McLaughlin, Matthew) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/7/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew T. McLaughlin on behalf of HBM Prenscia Inc., Spectris Inc., Spectris plc (aty to be noticed) (McLaughlin, Matthew) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/7/2019.]
May 3, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Joint Stipulation - Defendants' response/reply due 7/15/19 by Scott B. Abrams. (Marchese, Giovanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/7/2019.]
May 3, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Scott B. Abrams. HBM Prenscia Inc. waiver sent on 5/2/2019, answer due 7/1/2019; Spectris Inc. waiver sent on 5/2/2019, answer due 7/1/2019; Spectris plc waiver sent on 5/2/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (Marchese, Giovanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/7/2019.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to HBM Prenscia Inc., Spectris Inc., Spectris plc. (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/7/2019.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/7/2019.]
April 24, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Joseph F. Bianco and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/7/2019.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/7/2019.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Giovanna Maria Marchese on behalf of Scott B. Abrams (aty to be noticed) (Marchese, Giovanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/7/2019.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11410050 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Scott B. Abrams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit 1 - Share Purchase Agreement, #4 Exhibit 2 - Consulting Agreement) (Brickell, Jamie) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/7/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abrams v. HBM Prenscia Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spectris Inc.
Represented By: Elise Margaret Gabriel
Represented By: Melissa J. Friedman
Represented By: Alan E. Schoenfeld
Represented By: Matthew T. McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HBM Prenscia Inc.
Represented By: Elise Margaret Gabriel
Represented By: Melissa J. Friedman
Represented By: Alan E. Schoenfeld
Represented By: Matthew T. McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spectris plc
Represented By: Elise Margaret Gabriel
Represented By: Melissa J. Friedman
Represented By: Alan E. Schoenfeld
Represented By: Matthew T. McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott B. Abrams
Represented By: Jamie Mark Brickell
Represented By: Giovanna Maria Marchese
Represented By: Robert Justin DeBrauwere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?