Chevrestt v. Richard Tucker Music Foundation, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Angel Chevrestt
Defendant: RICHARD TUCKER MUSIC FOUNDATION, INC. d/b/a https://www.richardtucker.org/, Does 1 through 10 inclusive and Richard Tucker Music Foundation, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv10368
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Filing 9 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (pc)
November 18, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Richard Tucker Music Foundation, Inc. served on 11/14/2019, answer due 12/5/2019. Service was accepted by Peter Carwell, Executive Director. Document filed by Angel Chevrestt. (Ngo, Rayminh)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER: This case, involving claims under the Copyright Act, 17 U.S.C. 101 et seq., has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. In the Court's experience, cases involving copyright claims often benefit from early mediation. To that end, prior to a Rule 16(b) case management conference, the Court is referring this case to the Mediation Office for settlement purposes under Local Civil Rule 83.9. The parties are hereby notified that Local Rule 83.9 shall govern the mediation, and the parties are directedto participate in the mediation in good faith. No later than one week after the conclusion of all mediation in this case, the parties are directed to notify the Court whether they successfully resolved the case in mediation. The Court specifically requests that a mediator with expertise in copyright matters be assigned. The Court further directs that the deadline for Defendant(s) to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint shall be STAYED until 30 days after the conclusion of all Mediation in this case. If Plaintiff has effected service on Defendant(s), and Defendant(s) have failed to appear in the case or respond to the Complaint, and the Mediation Office has terminated mediation deadlines, Plaintiff must move for a default judgment in accordance with this Court's Individual Practices no later than 45 days after the termination of mediation deadlines. Mediators will be assigned based on the nature of suit. Additional expertise requests should promptly be directed to the Mediation Office. SO ORDERED. Please reference the following when corresponding with the Mediation Office. E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone (212) 805-0643, and facsimile (212) 805-0647. Mediator to be Assigned by 11/18/2019. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 11/08/2019) (ama)
November 8, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Richard Tucker Music Foundation, Inc.. (pc)
November 8, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
November 8, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
November 8, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
November 7, 2019 Filing 5 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Ngo, Rayminh)
November 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties. Document filed by Angel Chevrestt. (Ngo, Rayminh)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to RICHARD TUCKER MUSIC FOUNDATION, INC., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Angel Chevrestt. (Ngo, Rayminh)
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Ngo, Rayminh)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Does 1 through 10 inclusive, RICHARD TUCKER MUSIC FOUNDATION, INC. d/b/a https://www.richardtucker.org/. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17918966)Document filed by Angel Chevrestt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Ngo, Rayminh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chevrestt v. Richard Tucker Music Foundation, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD TUCKER MUSIC FOUNDATION, INC. d/b/a https://www.richardtucker.org/
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Tucker Music Foundation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Chevrestt
Represented By: Rayminh L Ngo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?