Chambers v. HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Plaintiff: Patrice Chambers
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2019cv10436
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332ds
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #13 MOTION for Eric H. Gibbs to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #14 MOTION for Nikul Shah to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18420978. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #12 MOTION for David M. Berger to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
January 3, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Nikul Shah to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18420978. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Patrice Chambers. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Nikul Shah, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kehoe, John)
January 3, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Eric H. Gibbs to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Patrice Chambers. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Eric H. Gibbs, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kehoe, John)
January 3, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for David M. Berger to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Patrice Chambers. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of David M. Berger, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kehoe, John)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #10 Letter filed by HSBC Bank USA, N.A.. ENDORSEMENT: The parties are directed to appear for a pre-motion conference on February 6, 2020 at 11:30am. The plaintiff is directed to respond to the defendant's letter by January 8, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Pre-Motion Conference set for 2/6/2020 at 11:30 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 1/3/2020) (kv)
January 3, 2020 Filing 10 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from James L. Bernard dated January 3, 2020 re: Requesting a Pre-Motion Conference on HSBC's proposed Motion to Dismiss etc.. Document filed by HSBC Bank USA, N.A..(Bernard, James)
December 18, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #8 MOTION for Eric H. Gibbs to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18304759. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #9 MOTION for David M. Berger to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18304763. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
December 17, 2019 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for David M. Berger to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18304763. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Patrice Chambers. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of David M. Berger, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kehoe, John) Modified on 12/18/2019 (wb).
December 17, 2019 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Eric H. Gibbs to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18304759. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Patrice Chambers. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Eric H. Gibbs, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kehoe, John) Modified on 12/18/2019 (wb).
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #5 Letter filed by HSBC Bank USA, N.A. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED to 1/03/2020., HSBC Bank USA, N.A. answer due 1/3/2020. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/05/2019) (ama)
December 5, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
December 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Raymond Alexander Garcia on behalf of HSBC Bank USA, N.A.. (Garcia, Raymond)
November 27, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Raymond A. Garcia dated November 27, 2019 re: Consented to Request for a 30 day extension of time from December 6, 2019 to and including January 6, 2020 to respond to the complaint. Document filed by HSBC Bank USA, N.A..(Garcia, Raymond)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A.. (pne)
November 12, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
November 12, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
November 12, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to HSBC BANK USA, N.A., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Patrice Chambers. (Kehoe, John)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Kehoe, John)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HSBC Bank USA, N.A.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17967966)Document filed by Patrice Chambers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Fee Schedule, #2 Exhibit B - Deposit Agreement)(Kehoe, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chambers v. HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrice Chambers
Represented By: John Anthony Kehoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Represented By: Raymond Alexander Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?