Calcano v. Uniqlo USA LLC
Plaintiff: Marcos Calcano
Defendant: Uniqlo USA LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv10438
Filed: November 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR UNIQLO USA LLC TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by the Parties, subject to the approval of the Court, that the date upon which Defendant is required to answer, move against, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended until January 27, 2020. Motions terminated: #6 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Complaint addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Stephanie Lindemuth dated December 12, 2019. filed by Uniqlo USA LLC. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 12/13/2019) Uniqlo USA LLC answer due 1/27/2020. (ks)
December 12, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Complaint addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Stephanie Lindemuth dated December 12, 2019. Document filed by Uniqlo USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stipulation and [Proposed] Order)(Lindemuth, Stephanie)
December 9, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Initial Conference set for 2/24/2020 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 14A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John G. Koeltl. (Fletcher, Donnie)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Uniqlo USA LLC served on 11/15/2019, answer due 12/6/2019. Service was accepted by B. Cruz, authorized agent. Document filed by Marcos Calcano. (Gottlieb, Jeffrey)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Uniqlo USA LLC. (sj)
November 12, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
November 12, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
November 12, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
November 12, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jeffrey Michael Gottlieb. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (sj)
November 9, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Uniqlo USA LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Marcos Calcano. (Gottlieb, Jeffrey)
November 9, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Gottlieb, Jeffrey)
November 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Uniqlo USA LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17993289)Document filed by Marcos Calcano.(Gottlieb, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calcano v. Uniqlo USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcos Calcano
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uniqlo USA LLC
Represented By: Stephanie L. Lindemuth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?