Nisbett v. Floravere Inc.
Plaintiff: Kareem Nisbett
Defendant: Floravere Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv10461
Filed: November 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331cv
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Floravere Inc. waiver sent on 11/19/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. Document filed by Kareem Nisbett. (Lipsky, Douglas)
November 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jamie Haar on behalf of Floravere Inc.. (Haar, Jamie)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: ORDERED that, within thirty (30) days of service of the summons and complaint, the parties must meet and confer for at least one hour in a good-faith attempt to settle this action. To the extent the parties are unable to settle the case themselves, they must also discuss whether further settlement discussions through the district's court-annexed mediation program or before amagistrate judge would be productive at this time. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within fifteen (15) additional days (i.e., within forty-five (45) days of service of the summons and complaint), the parties must submit a joint letter requesting that the Court either (1) refer the case to mediation or a magistrate judge (and indicate a preference between the two options), or (2) schedule an initial status conference in the matter. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 11/19/2019) (ama)
November 19, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:19-cv-07118-LTS-JLC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Floravere Inc.. (dnh)
November 12, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
November 12, 2019 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
November 12, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
November 11, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Floravere Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Kareem Nisbett. (Lowe, Christopher)
November 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lowe, Christopher)
November 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Floravere Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18029888)Document filed by Kareem Nisbett.(Lowe, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nisbett v. Floravere Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kareem Nisbett
Represented By: Christopher Howard Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Floravere Inc.
Represented By: Jamie Haar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?