ASAT Outdoors, LLC v. Chapter 4 Corp.
Plaintiff: ASAT Outdoors, LLC
Defendant: Chapter 4 Corp.
Case Number: 1:2019cv10462
Filed: November 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Debra C Freeman
Referring Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Catherine Irene Seibel on behalf of Chapter 4 Corp.. (Seibel, Catherine)
January 6, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Chapter 4 Corp..(Penchina, Robert)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Chapter 4 Corp. d/b/a Supreme may have until 1/6/20 to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Debra Freeman)(Text Only Order) (Freeman, Debra)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/11/2019) (cf)
December 5, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Robert Penchina dated December 5, 2019. Document filed by Chapter 4 Corp..(Penchina, Robert)
December 5, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Chapter 4 Corp..(Penchina, Robert)
December 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Penchina on behalf of Chapter 4 Corp.. (Penchina, Robert)
November 17, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Chapter 4 Corp. served on 11/14/2019, answer due 12/5/2019. Document filed by ASAT Outdoors, LLC. (Liebowitz, Richard)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Liebowitz, Richard)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chapter 4 Corp.. (dnh)
November 12, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
November 12, 2019 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
November 12, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
November 12, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz to submit a completed AO 121 Form Copyright to court for review. Use the event type AO 121 Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
November 12, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
November 11, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chapter 4 Corp., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by ASAT Outdoors, LLC. (Liebowitz, Richard)
November 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chapter 4 Corp.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18030452)Document filed by ASAT Outdoors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ASAT Outdoors, LLC v. Chapter 4 Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASAT Outdoors, LLC
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chapter 4 Corp.
Represented By: Robert Penchina
Represented By: Catherine Irene Seibel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?