Alcorn v. Insider, Inc.
Plaintiff: Victor Alcorn
Defendant: Insider, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv10464
Filed: November 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: P Kevin Castel
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER DECLARING CASE ELIGIBLE FOR MEDIATION: To the Clerk of Court: 1. This case is determined to be eligible for mediation as to all issues, as further set forth in this order. Mediation session is scheduled for January 28, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. Mediator may adjust date of first session by seven days. E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone (212) 805-0643, and facsimile (212) 805-0647. Mediator to be Assigned by 1/21/2020. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 1/9/2020) (jwh)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties consent to conducting all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. This case is to be tried to a jury. Amended pleadings may not be filed and additional parties may not be joined except with leave of the Court. Any motion to amend or to join additional parties shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this Order. Fact Discovery due by 5/8/2020. Initial requests for production of documents to be served by February 14, 2020. Interrogatories to be served by February 14, 2020. Deposition due by 5/8/2020. Expert Discovery due by 6/26/2020. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is: 2-3 days. Refer to Mediation for January 28 at 10 am. Case Management Conference set for 5/29/2020 at 11:30 AM before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 1/9/2020) (jwh)
January 9, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge P. Kevin Castel: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 1/9/2020. The case is referred to mediation, session scheduled for January 28, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. The next case management conference is scheduled for May 29, 2020 at 11:30 a.m., Courtroom 11D. (Nacanther, Florence)
January 9, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James H. Freeman on behalf of Victor Alcorn. (Freeman, James)
January 2, 2020 Filing 12 INITIAL REPORT OF PARTIES BEFORE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Document filed by Victor Alcorn.(Liebowitz, Richard)
December 10, 2019 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Axel Springer SE, Corporate Parent Axel Springer Digital Ventures GmbH for Insider, Inc.. Document filed by Insider, Inc..(Warshavsky, Oren)
December 10, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Insider, Inc..(Warshavsky, Oren)
December 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter Barrett Shapiro on behalf of Insider, Inc.. (Shapiro, Peter)
December 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Carrie Ann Longstaff on behalf of Insider, Inc.. (Longstaff, Carrie)
December 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Oren J. Warshavsky on behalf of Insider, Inc.. (Warshavsky, Oren)
November 17, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Insider, Inc. served on 11/13/2019, answer due 12/4/2019. Document filed by Victor Alcorn. (Liebowitz, Richard)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/9/2020 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 11/13/2019) (va)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Liebowitz, Richard)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Insider, Inc.. (dnh)
November 12, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
November 12, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
November 12, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
November 12, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz to submit a completed AO 121 Form Copyright to court for review. Use the event type AO 121 Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
November 12, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
November 11, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Insider, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Victor Alcorn. (Liebowitz, Richard)
November 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Insider, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18032316)Document filed by Victor Alcorn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alcorn v. Insider, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insider, Inc.
Represented By: Peter Barrett Shapiro
Represented By: Carrie Ann Longstaff
Represented By: Oren J. Warshavsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Alcorn
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Represented By: James H. Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?