Farmer v. Indyke et al
Plaintiff: Maria Farmer
Defendant: Darren K. Indyke and Richard D. Kahn
Intervenor: Mr. Alan Dershowitz
Case Number: 1:2019cv10474
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Naomi Reice Buchwald
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: In light of the foregoing, the Court denies as moot Dershowitz's request for leave to submit a motion to intervene, which was requested solely for the purpose of moving to strike the language at issue. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 12/23/2019) (ama)
December 16, 2019 Filing 11 LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Imran H. Ansari dated December 16, 2019 re: Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Dershowitz's Pre-Motion Conference Letter. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz.(Ansari, Imran)
December 11, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE re: #9 Letter (Response to Request for Pre-Motion Conference). Document filed by Maria Farmer. (Schiller, Joshua)
December 6, 2019 Filing 9 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Imran H. Ansari dated December 5, 2019 re: Request for Pre-Motion Conference. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz.(Ansari, Imran)
November 27, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Darren K. Indyke waiver sent on 11/25/2019, answer due 1/24/2020; Richard D. Kahn waiver sent on 11/25/2019, answer due 1/24/2020. Document filed by Maria Farmer. (Schiller, Joshua)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #6 Motion for Sigrid S. McCawley to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 11/25/2019) (jwh)
November 22, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #6 MOTION for Sigrid S. McCawley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18120580. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
November 21, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Sigrid S. McCawley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18120580. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Maria Farmer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sigrid S. McCawley, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(McCawley, Sigrid)
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Boies, II on behalf of Maria Farmer. (Boies, David)
November 18, 2019 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so redesignated. (wb)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Darren K. Indyke, Richard D. Kahn. (pc)
November 13, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
November 13, 2019 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
November 13, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Darren K. Indyke and Richard D. Kahn, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Maria Farmer. (Schiller, Joshua)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Schiller, Joshua)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Darren K. Indyke, Richard D. Kahn. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18036946)Document filed by Maria Farmer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schiller, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farmer v. Indyke et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darren K. Indyke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard D. Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Farmer
Represented By: Joshua Schiller
Represented By: Sigrid S. McCawley
Represented By: David Boies, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Mr. Alan Dershowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?