Helm v. Indyke et al
Plaintiff: Teresa Helm
Defendant: Darren K. Indyke and Richard D. Kahn
Case Number: 1:2019cv10476
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Debra C Freeman
Referring Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Filing 10 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman from Joshua I. Schiller and Bennet J. Moskowitz dated January 10, 2020 re: Status Update. Document filed by Teresa Helm.(Schiller, Joshua)
November 27, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Darren K. Indyke waiver sent on 11/25/2019, answer due 1/24/2020; Richard D. Kahn waiver sent on 11/25/2019, answer due 1/24/2020. Document filed by Teresa Helm. (Schiller, Joshua)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #7 Motion for Sigrid S. McCawley to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman on 11/25/2019) (va) Modified on 12/2/2019 (va). Modified on 12/2/2019 (va).
November 22, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #7 MOTION for Sigrid S. McCawley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18120704. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
November 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Sigrid S. McCawley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18120704. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Teresa Helm. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sigrid S. McCawley, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(McCawley, Sigrid)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/21/2019) (rjm)
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Boies, II on behalf of Teresa Helm. (Boies, David)
November 18, 2019 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so redesignated. (wb)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Darren K. Indyke, Richard D. Kahn. (pc)
November 13, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
November 13, 2019 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
November 13, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Darren K. Indyke and Richard D. Kahn, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Teresa Helm. (Schiller, Joshua)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Schiller, Joshua)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Darren K. Indyke, Richard D. Kahn. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18037565)Document filed by Teresa Helm. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schiller, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Helm v. Indyke et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darren K. Indyke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard D. Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Helm
Represented By: Joshua Schiller
Represented By: Sigrid S. McCawley
Represented By: David Boies, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?