Dorosh v. Long Island Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Alexander Dorosh
Defendant: Long Island Railroad Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv10484
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Filing 9 SECOND RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent MTA, Other Affiliate MTA Bridges & Tunnels, Other Affiliate MTA Bus Company and MTA Staten Island Railway, Other Affiliate MTA Metro North Commuter Railroad, Other Affiliate MTA - New York City Transit, Other Affiliate MTA Capital Construction Company for Long Island Railroad Company. Document filed by Long Island Railroad Company.(Pogan, Christopher)
January 3, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Christopher Joseph Pogan to RE-FILE Document #7 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Not All Corporate Parents/Other affiliates were added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). (ldi)
December 12, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Long Island Railroad Company.(Pogan, Christopher)
December 12, 2019 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - NOT ALL CORPORATE PARENTS/OTHER AFFILIATES WERE ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent MTA for Long Island Railroad Company. Document filed by Long Island Railroad Company.(Pogan, Christopher) Modified on 1/3/2020 (ldi).
December 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Joseph Pogan on behalf of Long Island Railroad Company. (Pogan, Christopher)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 4/2/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/26/2019) (jca)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Long Island Railroad Company. (pne)
November 13, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
November 13, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
November 13, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Wietzke, Marc)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Long Island Railroad Company, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Alexander Dorosh. (Wietzke, Marc)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Long Island Railroad Company. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18039327)Document filed by Alexander Dorosh.(Wietzke, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dorosh v. Long Island Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long Island Railroad Company
Represented By: Christopher Joseph Pogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Dorosh
Represented By: Marc Twyman Wietzke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?