Bowen v. Didyma Realty Bronx LLC
Plaintiff: Daniel Bowen
Defendant: Didyma Realty Bronx LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv10499
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Didyma Realty Bronx LLC served on 11/26/2019, answer due 12/17/2019. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, Business Document Specialist. Document filed by Daniel Bowen. (Ramirez, Hector)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Didyma Realty Bronx LLC. (dnh)
November 13, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
November 13, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
November 13, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Ramirez, Hector)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Didyma Realty Bronx LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Daniel Bowen. (Ramirez, Hector)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Didyma Realty Bronx LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18044424)Document filed by Daniel Bowen.(Ramirez, Hector)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowen v. Didyma Realty Bronx LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Bowen
Represented By: Hector V. Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Didyma Realty Bronx LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?