Calcano v. Dos Toros Holdings LLC
Plaintiff: Marcos Calcano
Defendant: DOS TOROS HOLDINGS LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv10534
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Filing 10 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Nancy V. Wright dated January 9, 2019 re: (requesting an extension of time to file Answer). Document filed by Dos Toros Holdings LLC.(Wright, Nancy)
January 9, 2020 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Dos Toros Holdings LLC.(Wright, Nancy)
January 9, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joanna Colacurcio on behalf of Dos Toros Holdings LLC. (Colacurcio, Joanna)
January 9, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nancy V. Wright on behalf of Dos Toros Holdings LLC. (Wright, Nancy)
November 20, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Dos Toros Holdings LLC waiver sent on 11/20/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. Document filed by Marcos Calcano. (Gottlieb, Jeffrey)
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/3/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 11/14/2019) (va)
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dos Toros Holdings LLC. (pc)
November 14, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
November 14, 2019 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
November 14, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
November 14, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jeffrey Michael Gottlieb. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
November 14, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jeffrey Michael Gottlieb. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: DOS TOROS HOLDINGS LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (pc)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to DOS TOROS HOLDINGS LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Marcos Calcano. (Gottlieb, Jeffrey)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Gottlieb, Jeffrey)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DOS TOROS HOLDINGS LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18051874)Document filed by Marcos Calcano.(Gottlieb, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calcano v. Dos Toros Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOS TOROS HOLDINGS LLC
Represented By: Joanna Colacurcio
Represented By: Nancy V. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcos Calcano
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?