Hidalgo v. Amateur Athletic Union of the United States, Inc.
Plaintiff: Timothy Hidalgo
Defendant: Amateur Athletic Union of the United States, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv10545
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332t
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Filing 15 LETTER RESPONSE in Support of Motion addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from William B. Federman dated January 8, 2020 re: #13 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Paul Ferrillo dated January 7, 2020. . Document filed by Timothy Hidalgo. (Federman, William)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application granted. Because the time to move or answer is stayed until 30 days after decision of the Motion to Compel arbitration, there is no need to address the request for a pre-motion conference. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 1/8/2020) (ks)
January 7, 2020 Filing 13 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Paul Ferrillo dated January 7, 2020. Document filed by Amateur Athletic Union of the United States, Inc..(Ferrillo, Paul)
January 7, 2020 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Debra Kimbrell in Support re: #10 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and. MOTION to Stay Action.. Document filed by Amateur Athletic Union of the United States, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application Screen, #2 Exhibit B - AAU Code Book Screen, #3 Exhibit C - 2019 AAU National Policies)(Ferrillo, Paul)
January 7, 2020 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #10 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and. MOTION to Stay Action. . Document filed by Amateur Athletic Union of the United States, Inc.. (Ferrillo, Paul)
January 7, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and., MOTION to Stay Action. Document filed by Amateur Athletic Union of the United States, Inc..(Ferrillo, Paul)
January 7, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Andrew Wargo on behalf of Amateur Athletic Union of the United States, Inc.. (Wargo, William)
January 7, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen L. Saxl on behalf of Amateur Athletic Union of the United States, Inc.. (Saxl, Stephen)
January 7, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul A. Ferrillo on behalf of Amateur Athletic Union of the United States, Inc.. (Ferrillo, Paul)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint from 12/13/19 until 1/7/2020 addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Paul Ferrillo dated December 9, 2019. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Amateur Athletic Union of the United States, Inc. answer due 1/7/2020. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 12/10/2019) (va)
December 9, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint from 12/13/19 until 1/7/2020 addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Paul Ferrillo dated December 9, 2019. Document filed by Amateur Athletic Union of the United States, Inc..(Ferrillo, Paul)
December 9, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Initial Conference set for 2/25/2020 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 14A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John G. Koeltl. (Fletcher, Donnie)
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Amateur Athletic Union of the United States, Inc.. (dnh)
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Amateur Athletic Union of the United States, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Timothy Hidalgo. (Federman, William)
November 14, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney William Bernard Federman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Timothy Hidalgo, Amateur Athletic Union of the United States, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (pne)
November 14, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney William Bernard Federman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Defendant code 1 (Citizen of This State); County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 4 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-This State); the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (pne)
November 14, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
November 14, 2019 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
November 14, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Federman, William)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amateur Athletic Union of the United States, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number BNYSDC-18055620)Document filed by Timothy Hidalgo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit California Notice)(Federman, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hidalgo v. Amateur Athletic Union of the United States, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Hidalgo
Represented By: William Bernard Federman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amateur Athletic Union of the United States, Inc.
Represented By: Paul A. Ferrillo
Represented By: William Andrew Wargo
Represented By: Stephen L. Saxl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?