Girotto v. Wilfie & Nell LLC et al
Plaintiff: Luigi Girotto
Defendant: 228 West 4th Owners Corp. and Wilfie & Nell LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv10546
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED BY AND BETWEEN counsel for the Plaintiff Luigi Girotto and counsel for Defendant 228 West 4th Owners Corp. that the time within which Defendant 228 West 4th Owners Corp. may answer, move against or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this action is hereby adjourned to and until January 31, 2020. SO ORDERED., 228 West 4th Owners Corp. answer due 1/31/2020; Wilfie & Nell LLC answer due 1/31/2020., Motions terminated: #12 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Gerald C. Waters, Jr., Esq. dated December 24, 2019. filed by 228 West 4th Owners Corp. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 12/27/2019) (ama)
December 24, 2019 Filing 12 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Gerald C. Waters, Jr., Esq. dated December 24, 2019. Document filed by 228 West 4th Owners Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation Extending Time to Answer)(Waters, Gerald)
December 23, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Larry Rafael Martinez on behalf of 228 West 4th Owners Corp.. (Martinez, Larry)
December 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan D. Farrell on behalf of 228 West 4th Owners Corp.. (Farrell, Jonathan)
December 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gerald Charles Waters on behalf of 228 West 4th Owners Corp.. (Waters, Gerald)
November 29, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Wilfie & Nell LLC served on 11/26/2019, answer due 12/17/2019. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, as Authorized Agent of the Office of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Luigi Girotto. (Weitz, Ben-Zion)
November 29, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. 228 West 4th Owners Corp. served on 11/26/2019, answer due 12/17/2019. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, as Authorized Agent of the Office of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Luigi Girotto. (Weitz, Ben-Zion)
November 20, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 228 West 4th Owners Corp.. (dnh)
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Wilfie & Nell LLC. (dnh)
November 19, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 228 WEST 4TH OWNERS CORP., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Luigi Girotto. (Weitz, Ben-Zion)
November 19, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to WILFIE & NELL LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Luigi Girotto. (Weitz, Ben-Zion)
November 14, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
November 14, 2019 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
November 14, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Weitz, Ben-Zion)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 228 West 4th Owners Corp., Wilfie & Nell LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18055936)Document filed by Luigi Girotto.(Weitz, Ben-Zion)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Girotto v. Wilfie & Nell LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 228 West 4th Owners Corp.
Represented By: Gerald Charles Waters
Represented By: Jonathan D. Farrell
Represented By: Larry Rafael Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilfie & Nell LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luigi Girotto
Represented By: Ben-Zion Bradley Weitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?