Shukla v. Deloitte Consulting LLP
Plaintiff: ashu shukla
Defendant: Deloitte Consulting LLP
Case Number: 1:2019cv10578
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Stewart D Aaron
Referring Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: On November 27, 2019, the Undersigned scheduled an Initial Pretrial Conference in this matter on April 24, 2020. Dkt. No. 11. Because this case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Aaron for purposes of general pretrial management, the April 24, 2020 conference is hereby canceled. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 1/10/2020) (rro)
January 10, 2020 Mailed a copy of #27 Memo Endorsement, to ashu shukla 202 Salem Court Apt. 11 Princeton, NJ 08540. (vba)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #26 Letter filed by ashu shukla. ENDORSEMENT: At the Court conference, Plaintiff consented to withdraw his remand motion without taking the additional time to consider the issue that was offered to him by the Court. Nevertheless, the Court hereby grants Plaintiff until January 17, 2020 to decide if he wants to reinstate his motion to remand, in which case I will decide it promptly. Plaintiff should note that once a case has been removed to federal court, the state court is divested of jurisdiction for all purposes. Plaintiff is once again reminded about the resources available to him through the NYLAG Pro Se Clinic. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully instructed to mail this memo endorsement to the Pro Se Plaintiff. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 1/9/2020) (va) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
January 10, 2020 Filing 26 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Ashu Shukla dated 01/10/2020 re: Requesting an order for New York Supreme Court to present their verdict on pending motions. Document filed by ashu shukla.(shukla, ashu)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Amend/Correct. Defendant consents to accept Plaintiff's proposed First Amended Complaint as the operative pleading without prejudice to any and all defenses and reserving its right to move against the claims contained therein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 1/8/2020) (Text Only Order) (kl)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER terminating #13 Motion to Remand to State Court. Plaintiff consents to withdraw this motion. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 1/8/2020) (Text Only Order) (kl)
January 8, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron: Status Conference held on 1/8/2020. (kl)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: It has come to the Court's attention that there is a dispute between the parties regarding an Order of the Court dated December 11, 2019 (see ECF No. 19), and the impact it has on the briefing schedule of pro se Plaintiff's two motions. (See, e.g., ECF Nos. 13, 14.) For the avoidance of any doubt, the reason the Court has called a conference on January 8, 2020 to discuss briefing schedules with the parties is because the briefing schedule related to Plaintiff's motions is extended until the time of the conference, when it will be further extended. The briefing schedule will be set on January 8, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 12/13/2019) (mml)
December 12, 2019 Filing 22 ADDENDUM(Appendix) TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Document filed by ashu shukla.(sc)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #20 Letter filed by ashu shukla. ENDORSEMENT: The Court is in receipt of pro se Plaintiff's letter, and will reserve discussion of the substantive issues raised until the conference before the Court. As to the date of the conference, going forward, Plaintiff shall refer to and comply with Judge Aaron's Individual Rules of Practices (found at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-stewart-d-aaron) before filing documents. Specifically the rules require that parties seeking an adjournment of a conference must first confer with their adversary, and propose alternate dates that all sides are available. In this instance, however, the December 19, 2019 conference is adjourned until Wednesday, January 8, 2020 at 3:30 p.m. in Courtroom 11C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007. SO ORDERED. (Status Conference set for 1/8/2020 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 11C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 12/12/2019) (js)
December 12, 2019 Filing 20 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Ashu Shukla dated 12/12/2019 re: Follow up on court conference date and defense attorney letters. Document filed by ashu shukla.(shukla, ashu)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER SCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE: The parties are directed to appear for a status conference on Thursday, December 19, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 11C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007. The parties shall be prepared to discuss a briefing schedule for Plaintiff's motions for remand (ECF No. 13) and to amend his complaint (ECF No. 14), as well as the issues raised in Defendants' letters dated November 21, 2019 (ECF No. 7) and December 9, 2019. (ECF No. 16.) (Status Conference set for 12/19/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 11C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 12/11/2019) (js)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing. Request GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 12/10/2019) (kl)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 12/10/19) (yv)
December 9, 2019 Filing 16 LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Heather Weine Brochin dated December 9, 2019 re: Plaintiff's Remand and Leave Motions. Document filed by Deloitte Consulting LLP.(Brochin, Heather)
December 4, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT COMPLAINT AGAINST THE DEFENDANT, DELOITTE CONSULTING LLP, PURS. TO FRCP RULE 15, re: #14 MOTION to Amend/Correct. Document filed by Ashu Shukla. (sc)
December 4, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT IN FEDERAL COURT. Document filed by Ashu Shukla.(sc)
December 3, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF MOTION; re: for an Order to Remand to State Court. Document filed by Ashu Shukla.(sc)
December 3, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION FOR PERMISSION FOR FILING ELECTRONIC CASE FILING, re: for Permission for Ashu Shukla to participate in electronic case filing in this case. Document filed by Ashu Shukla.(sc)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) Initial Conference set for 4/24/2020 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 11/27/2019) (kv)
November 26, 2019 Filing 10 PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Ashu Shukla consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Ashu Shukla.(sc)
November 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE PRO SE by Ashu Shukla. (sc)
November 21, 2019 Filing 8 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #7 Letter filed by Deloitte Consulting LLP. ENDORSEMENT: This case is being reassigned. In the meantime defendant need not file any add'l papers. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/21/2019) (jca)
November 21, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein is no longer assigned to the case. (ad)
November 21, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Heather Weine Brochin dated 11/21/19 re: Guidance Post-Removal. Document filed by Deloitte Consulting LLP.(Brochin, Heather)
November 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gregory Scott Tabakman on behalf of Deloitte Consulting LLP. (Tabakman, Gregory)
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Heather Weine Brochin on behalf of Deloitte Consulting LLP. (Brochin, Heather)
November 15, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
November 15, 2019 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
November 15, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Brochin, Heather)
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Deloitte LLP for Deloitte Consulting LLP. Document filed by Deloitte Consulting LLP.(Brochin, Heather)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal served on Ashu Shukla on 11/14/19. Service was made by UPS Next Day Air. Document filed by Deloitte Consulting LLP. (Brochin, Heather)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from New York, County of New York. Case Number: 151144/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18066831).Document filed by Deloitte Consulting LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Initial Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Defendant's Answer, #3 Exhibit Preliminary Conference Order, #4 Exhibit Corrected First Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit Second Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit Third Amended Complaint, #7 Exhibit NYSCEF Docket)(Brochin, Heather)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shukla v. Deloitte Consulting LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deloitte Consulting LLP
Represented By: Heather Weine Brochin
Represented By: Gregory Scott Tabakman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ashu shukla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?